This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/16/2021 at 06:06:13 (UTC).

The Bank of New York Mellon v. Maria Loyo-Morales, et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 The Bank of New York Mellon filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Maria Loyo-Morales,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16041

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Defendants

KIMBERLY TIBONI

NORTHGATE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.

Defendant / Appellant

MARIA LOYO-MORALES

Plaintiff / Appellee

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates,Series 2005-13, FKA The Bank of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Robert Christopher Reade Esquire

Jay A. Shafer

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Scott Lachman

Ariel Edward Stern Esquire

Natalie L. Winslow Esquire

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#4

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12195984] (CL) [Entered: 08/09/2021 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/09/2021, 11:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12183579] (CL) [Entered: 07/26/2021 05:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/26/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12168384] (CL) [Entered: 07/09/2021 02:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/30/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12159124]. [21-16041] (AD) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/30/2021. [12158971] [21-16041] (Shafer, Jay) [Entered: 06/30/2021 11:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Jay A. Shafer for party(s) Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales, in case 21-16041. [12158111] (JFF) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jay A. Shafer, Esq. (Cory Reade Dows & Shafer) for Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales. Date of service: 06/29/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12158079] [21-16041] (Shafer, Jay) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/24/2021. Transcript ordered by 07/16/2021. Transcript due 08/16/2021. Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales opening brief due 09/24/2021. Appellee The Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 10/25/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12147340] (JBS) [Entered: 06/17/2021 01:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less