This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 06:32:29 (UTC).

Tessier v. Commissioner, SSA

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Tessier filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, SSA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-4002

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER, SSA

Plaintiff / Appellant

HEIDI M. TESSIER

Salt Lake City, UT 84121

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kathryn C. Bostwick

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Amanda A. Berndt

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

111 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Richard W. Pruett

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Marva Match

Attorney at Match and Farnsworth

243 East 400 South, Suite 111

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Heidi M. Tessier

5682 South Park Place East

Salt Lake City, UT 84121

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

[10716923] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Marva Match's motion to withdraw as attorney for appellant. Ms. Tessier shall file an entry of appearance on or before 02/24/2020. Appellant's opening brief deadline is extended to 03/23/2020 for Heidi M. Tessier. Served on 02/10/2020. [20-4002] [Entered: 02/10/2020 04:52 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Restricted Document #1

Preliminary Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10722582] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance due on 03/11/2020 for Heidi M. Tessier. [20-4002] [Entered: 03/04/2020 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10716954] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol I - Pleadings. [20-4002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 07:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket[10716926] Minute order filed - Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 03/02/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-4002] [Entered: 02/10/2020 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10716923] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Marva Match's motion to withdraw as attorney for appellant. Ms. Tessier shall file an entry of appearance on or before 02/24/2020. Appellant's opening brief deadline is extended to 03/23/2020 for Heidi M. Tessier. Served on 02/10/2020. [20-4002] [Entered: 02/10/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10716499] Motion filed by Appellant Heidi M. Tessier for attorney Marva Match to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 02/07/2020. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-4002] MM [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10715887] Second deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 02/10/2020 for Heidi M. Tessier. [20-4002] [Entered: 02/06/2020 07:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713831] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 02/03/2020 for Heidi M. Tessier. [20-4002] [Entered: 01/29/2020 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712859] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/24/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/04/2020 for Heidi M. Tessier. [20-4002] [Entered: 01/24/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket[10712507] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/31/2020 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-4002] [Entered: 01/24/2020 07:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712482] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Heidi M. Tessier. Transcript ordered: No transcript is necessary for this appeal.. Served on: 01/23/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-4002] MM [Entered: 01/23/2020 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10712480] Docketing statement filed by Heidi M. Tessier. Served on 01/23/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-4002] --[Edited 01/24/2020 by SLS to replace PDF with text-searchable version.] MM [Entered: 01/23/2020 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10711914] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard W. Pruett for Commissioner, SSA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4002] [Entered: 01/22/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket[10711884] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard W. Pruett for Appellee Commissioner, SSA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4002] --[Edited 01/22/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] RWP [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10709550] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/13/2020 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 01/28/2020 for Heidi M. Tessier. Notice of appearance due on 01/28/2020 for Commissioner, SSA [20-4002] [Entered: 01/14/2020 07:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less