This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2019 at 06:06:47 (UTC).

Terry Trentacosta v. Lorie Davis, Director

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 Terry Trentacosta filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Lorie Davis, Director. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-50222

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

TERRY TRENTACOSTA

Respondent / Appellee

LORIE DAVIS, DIRECTOR, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS DIVISION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Ashley Byron Burleson

1001 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Jessica Michelle Manojlovich

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Cara Hanna

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc 067)

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/15/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Mr. Ashley Byron Burleson for Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [19-50222] (BPL) [Entered: 03/27/2019 09:03 AM]

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta I tried to select the event this letter is related to, but the Related Entries select below is not working. This letter is to give the court permission to use appellant's 03/28/2019 prematurely filed Opposed Motion for Appealability and Brief.. Date of Service: 04/12/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Burleson; Attorney for Appellees: Hanna, Manojlovich [19-50222] (Ashley Byron Burleson ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:06 AM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-50222] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 03/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Burleson; Attorney for Appellees: Hanna, Manojlovich [19-50222] (Ashley Byron Burleson ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:30 AM]

Open Document

LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 05/20/2019 for Appellant Terry Trentacosta. Brief in Support due on 05/20/2019 for Appellant Terry Trentacosta [19-50222] (DDL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:56 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50222] (Ashley Byron Burleson ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 06:49 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011643-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 04/08/2019 for Appellant Terry Trentacosta [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:17 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50222] (Jessica Michelle Manojlovich ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 03:52 PM]

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta for certificate of appealability [9028733-2]. Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50222] (Ashley Byron Burleson ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 07:23 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9028733-2 ] (INCORPORATED IN MOTION FOR COA) Brief in Support deadline satisfied. [9028741-1] [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta for certificate of appealability [9028733-2]. Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta I tried to select the event this letter is related to, but the Related Entries select below is not working. This letter is to give the court permission to use appellant's 03/28/2019 prematurely filed Opposed Motion for Appealability and Brief.. Date of Service: 04/12/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Burleson; Attorney for Appellees: Hanna, Manojlovich [19-50222] (Ashley Byron Burleson ) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 05/20/2019 for Appellant Terry Trentacosta. Brief in Support due on 05/20/2019 for Appellant Terry Trentacosta [19-50222] (DDL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50222] (DDL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Oposed motion for COA received from Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta because premature [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-50222] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 03/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Burleson; Attorney for Appellees: Hanna, Manojlovich [19-50222] (Ashley Byron Burleson ) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ashley Byron Burleson for Appellant Terry Trentacosta in 19-50222 [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jessica Michelle Manojlovich for party(s) Appellee Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division, in case 19-50222 (RAJ) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Mr. Ashley Byron Burleson for Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [19-50222] (BPL) [Entered: 03/27/2019 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50222] (Ashley Byron Burleson ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 07:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50222] (Ashley Byron Burleson ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50222] (Jessica Michelle Manojlovich ) [Entered: 03/26/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-892. Electronic ROA due on 04/08/2019. [19-50222] (MFY) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta. Fee deadline satisfied [19-50222] (MFY) [Entered: 03/22/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011643-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 04/08/2019 for Appellant Terry Trentacosta [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Terry Trentacosta [19-50222] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/15/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.