This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2021 at 06:07:21 (UTC).

Terry Paulsen v. Abbott Laboratories Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Terry Paulsen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2877

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TERRY PAULSEN

Defendant / Appellees

ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC., an Illinois Corporation

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., a wholly owned subsidary of Takeda Chemical Industries LTD., an Illinois corporation

TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED, a New York corporation

ABBVIE INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC., an Illinois corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Alan S. Levin

Attorney at ALAN S. LEVIN, P.C.

P.O. Box 4703

Incline Village, NV 89450

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Paula S. Quist

Attorney at JONES DAY

77 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-1692

Nicole C. Henning

Attorney at JONES DAY

77 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-1692

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Terry Paulsen by 10/20/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 10/28/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/23/2021 for Terry Paulsen. [1] [7191995] [21-2877] (MM) [Entered: 10/14/2021 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAP Pharmaceutical Products, Inc. f/k/a TAP Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AbbVie, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. is a litigant