This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2019 at 06:11:11 (UTC).

Terrence Stevens v. Plumbers and Pipefitters Local, et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Terrence Stevens filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Plumbers and Pipefitters Local. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11446

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BENESYS, in the capacity as third-party plan administrator for day to day operations of Defendant II, Defendant III and Defendant IV

PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 219 INDUSTRY PENSION TRUST FUND, or Annuity Fund may be known as Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 2 Industry Trust Fund

PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 219, (Labor Union)

PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL 219 INDUSTRY TRUST FUND, or Annuity Fund may be known as Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 2 Industry Trust Fund E.I.N.

PLUMBERS AND PIPFITTERS LOCAL 219 PENSION FUND, or Annuity Fund may be known as Plumbers and Pipfitters Local 2 Industry Pension Fund

PNC VESTED INTEREST

Plaintiff / Appellant

TERRENCE STEVENS

College Park, GA 30337

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph Daniel Mando

Attorney at Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips, LLC

20445 Emerald Parkway Drive, Po Box 44135-1629

Cleveland, OH 44135

Joseph Carl Hoffman Jr.

Attorney at Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips, LLC

20445 Emerald Parkway Drive, Po Box 44135-1629

Cleveland, OH 44135

Michael Blair Schoenfeld

Attorney at Stanford Fagan, LLC

20445 Emerald Parkway Drive, Po Box 44135-1629

Cleveland, OH 44135

Joseph C. Hoffman Jr.

Attorney at Faulkner Hoffman & Phillips, LLC

20445 Emerald Parkway Dr Ste 210, Po Box 44135-1629

Cleveland, OH 44135

Joseph D. Mando

Attorney at Faulkner Hoffman & Phillips, LLC

20445 Emerald Parkway Dr Ste 210, Po Box 44135-1629

Cleveland, OH 44135

James D. Fagan Jr.

Attorney at Stanford Fagan, LLC

2540 Lakewood Ave Sw

Atlanta, GA 30315

David S. Fryman

Attorney at Ballard Spahr, LLP

1735 Market St Fl 51

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

Shaina Elise Hicks

Attorney at Ballard Spahr, LLP

1735 Market St Fl 51

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

Sarah T. Reise

Attorney at Ballard Spahr, LLP

999 Peachtree St Ste 1000

Atlanta, GA 30309-4471

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Terrence Stevens

2459 Roosevelt Hwy Ste A10

College Park, GA 30337

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr. for Benesys, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Pension Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Trust Fund and Plumbers and Pipfitters Local 219 Pension Fund. [19-11446] (ECF: Joseph Hoffman) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:33 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph D. Mando for Benesys, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Pension Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Trust Fund and Plumbers and Pipfitters Local 219 Pension Fund. [19-11446] (ECF: Joseph Mando) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:30 AM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Terrence Stevens. [Entered: 05/29/2019 10:33 AM]

Open Document

Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Party Terrence Stevens. Appellants brief due on 05/28/2019; Extension Granted to 06/11/2019 as to Appellant Terrence Stevens. Appendix due on 06/18/2019 as to Appellant Terrence Stevens. [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:32 AM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Joseph Daniel Mando is GRANTED by Supervisor. [8782252-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Joseph Carl Hoffman, Jr. is GRANTED by Supervisor. [8782243-2] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:57 AM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee PNC Vested Interest [19-11446] (ECF: Sarah Reise) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:53 PM]

Open Document #2

CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (CIP)

Open Document #1

Response to Jurisdictional Question with Motion

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James D. Fagan, Jr. for all Appellees except PNC Vested Interest and John Doe #17 (Investment Manager) [19-11446] (ECF: James Fagan) [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:14 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Shaina E. Hicks is GRANTED by Supervisor. [8770564-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by David S. Fryman is GRANTED by Supervisor. [8770559-2] [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:34 AM]

Open Document #2

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

JQ Issued

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah T. Reise for PNC Vested Interest [19-11446] (ECF: Sarah Reise) [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:35 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Terrence Stevens. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:06 PM]

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC #50 Opinion & Order

Open Document #2

DC #51 Judgment

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr. for Benesys, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Pension Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Trust Fund and Plumbers and Pipfitters Local 219 Pension Fund. [19-11446] (ECF: Joseph Hoffman) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph D. Mando for Benesys, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Pension Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Trust Fund and Plumbers and Pipfitters Local 219 Pension Fund. [19-11446] (ECF: Joseph Mando) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Terrence Stevens. [Entered: 05/29/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Party Terrence Stevens. Appellants brief due on 05/28/2019; Extension Granted to 06/11/2019 as to Appellant Terrence Stevens. Appendix due on 06/18/2019 as to Appellant Terrence Stevens. [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Joseph Daniel Mando is GRANTED by Supervisor. [8782252-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Joseph Carl Hoffman, Jr. is GRANTED by Supervisor. [8782243-2] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee PNC Vested Interest [19-11446] (ECF: Sarah Reise) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Benesys, Plumbers and Pipfitters Local 219 Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Pension Trust Fund and Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Trust Fund. [19-11446]--[Edited 05/24/2019 by CRL, counsel selected incorporated motion in error, corrected by the clerk's office. per counsel, there's no incorporated motion in juris response] (ECF: James Fagan) [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James D. Fagan, Jr. for all Appellees except PNC Vested Interest and John Doe #17 (Investment Manager) [19-11446] (ECF: James Fagan) [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shaina E. Hicks for PNC Vested Interest Miss Shaina Elise Hicks for PNC Vested Interest. [19-11446] (ECF: Shaina Hicks) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Joseph Daniel Mando for Appellees Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Pension Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 Industry Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipfitters Local 219 Pension Fund and Benesys. [8782252-1] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Terrence Stevens and Sarah T. Reise for PNC Vested Interest. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/16/2019 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David S. Fryman for PNC Vested Interest David S. Fryman for PNC Vested Interest. [19-11446] (ECF: David Fryman) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Terrence Stevens. [Entered: 05/15/2019 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Shaina E. Hicks is GRANTED by Supervisor. [8770564-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by David S. Fryman is GRANTED by Supervisor. [8770559-2] [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Terrence Stevens. [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Shaina E. Hicks for Appellee PNC Vested Interest. [8770564-1] [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney David S. Fryman for Appellee PNC Vested Interest. [8770559-1] [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah T. Reise for PNC Vested Interest [19-11446] (ECF: Sarah Reise) [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Terrence Stevens. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Terrence Stevens on 04/12/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/30/2019 as to Appellant Terrence Stevens. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/14/2019 as to Appellee Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 219 [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.