This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/23/2021 at 06:10:04 (UTC).

Terrance Marsh, et al v. AFSCME Local 3299, et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Terrance Marsh, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AFSCME Local 3299,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15309

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

TERRANCE MARSH

KAREN JORDAN

BARBARA GROSSE

STACEY DAVIDSON

TAMELA DIOSO

SANDI EDDE

REBECCA VAN ANTWERP

LINDSAY MACOMBER

KISKA CARTER

THEODORE MENDOZA

Defendant / Appellees

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

MICHAEL V. DRAKE, M.D., M.D., in his official capacity as President of the University of California

AFSCME LOCAL 3299

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mariah Gondeiro Esquire

Shella Sadovnik

Rebekah Millard

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Anthony Paul O'Brien Esquire

Gilbert J. Tsai

Adam W. Hofmann

Jeffrey B. Demain Esquire

Arthur Liou

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellants Kiska Carter, Stacey Davidson, Tamela Dioso, Sandi Edde, Barbara Grosse, Karen Jordan, Lindsay Macomber, Terrance Marsh, Theodore Mendoza and Rebecca Van Antwerp to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Kiska Carter, Stacey Davidson, Tamela Dioso, Sandi Edde, Barbara Grosse, Karen Jordan, Lindsay Macomber, Terrance Marsh, Theodore Mendoza and Rebecca Van Antwerp opening brief due 05/24/2021. Appellees AFSCME Local 3299, Xavier Becerra and Michael V. Drake answering brief due 06/23/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12067228] (DLM) [Entered: 04/07/2021 05:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Kiska Carter, Stacey Davidson, Tamela Dioso, Sandi Edde, Barbara Grosse, Karen Jordan, Lindsay Macomber, Terrance Marsh, Theodore Mendoza and Rebecca Van Antwerp. New requested due date is 05/24/2021. [12067173] [21-15309] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 04/07/2021 04:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12031525] (BLS) [Entered: 03/10/2021 05:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Adam W. Hofmann for party(s) Appellee Michael V. Drake. [12021246] (RL) [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam Wolff Hofmann (Hanson Bridgett LLP, 500 Capitol Mall, Suite 1500, Sacramento, CA 95814) for Appellee Michael V. Drake, M.D.. Date of service: 03/02/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12021234] [21-15309] (Hofmann, Adam) [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/01/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12020794]. [21-15309] (AD) [Entered: 03/01/2021 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Kiska Carter, Tamela Dioso, Sandi Edde, Barbara Grosse, Karen Jordan, Lindsay Macomber, Terrance Marsh, Theodore Mendoza, Rebecca Van Antwerp and Stacey Davidson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/01/2021. [12020290] [21-15309] (Millard, Rebekah) [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Kiska Carter, Stacey Davidson, Tamela Dioso, Sandi Edde, Barbara Grosse, Karen Jordan, Lindsay Macomber, Terrance Marsh, Theodore Mendoza and Rebecca Van Antwerp Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/01/2021. Appellants Kiska Carter, Stacey Davidson, Tamela Dioso, Sandi Edde, Barbara Grosse, Karen Jordan, Lindsay Macomber, Terrance Marsh, Theodore Mendoza and Rebecca Van Antwerp opening brief due 04/23/2021. Appellees AFSCME Local 3299, Xavier Becerra and Michael V. Drake answering brief due 05/24/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12012262] (RT) [Entered: 02/22/2021 03:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less