This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 06:07:35 (UTC).

Teresita Canuto v. Nancy Pelosi, et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Teresita Canuto filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nancy Pelosi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5016

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Eric Garcetti, Mayor of City of Los Angeles

Kevin Matthew McCarthy, Rep.

Gary L. Palmer, Rep.

Hakeem Jeffries, Rep.

Steny H. Hoyer, Rep.

James Clyburn

Stephen Joseph Scalise, Rep.

Elizabeth Cheney

Ben Ray Lujan, Rep.

Nancy Pelosi, Rep.

Gavin Newsom, Governor of California

Plaintiff / Appellant

Teresita A. Canuto

Van Nuys, CA 91406

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah Edith Clouse

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Douglas N. Letter

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Todd B. Tatelman

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Catherine Abigial Joan Woodbridge

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of California

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814-2550

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Teresita A. Canuto

8101 Langdon Avenue, #30

Van Nuys, CA 91406

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1834730] for response [ # 1833754-2 ] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [20-5016] [Entered: 03/23/2020 12:30 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1833787] for motion for summary affirmance [ # 1833536-2 ] filed by Gavin Newsom. [20-5016] (Woodbridge, Catherine) [Entered: 03/16/2020 06:27 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1833754] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1833536-2 ] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 03/16/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 6 pages. [20-5016] [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:59 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1833536] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 03/23/2020). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/23/2020) filed by Gavin Newsom (Service Date: 03/13/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: Motion is 932 words or 6 pages; Exhibits A-G attached Bate stamped begin page 7-67. [20-5016] (Woodbridge, Catherine) [Entered: 03/13/2020 05:19 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1833116] advising that a brief will not be filed filed by Elizabeth Cheney, James Clyburn, Steny H. Hoyer, Hakeem Jeffries, Ben Ray Lujan, Kevin Matthew McCarthy, Gary L. Palmer, Nancy Pelosi and Stephen Joseph Scalise [Service Date: 03/11/2020 ] [20-5016] (Clouse, Sarah) [Entered: 03/11/2020 05:42 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1831569] filed by Gavin Newsom [Service Date: 03/04/2020 ] [20-5016] (Woodbridge, Catherine) [Entered: 03/04/2020 09:15 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1831565] filed by Catherine Woodbridge on behalf of Appellee Gavin Newsom. [20-5016] (Woodbridge, Catherine) [Entered: 03/04/2020 09:12 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1831156] filed by Elizabeth Cheney, James Clyburn, Steny H. Hoyer, Hakeem Jeffries, Ben Ray Lujan, Kevin Matthew McCarthy, Gary L. Palmer, Nancy Pelosi and Stephen Joseph Scalise [Service Date: 03/02/2020 ] [20-5016] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 03/02/2020 02:25 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1831154] filed by Douglas N. Letter and co-counsel Todd B. Tatelman and Sarah Clouse on behalf of Appellees Elizabeth Cheney, James Clyburn, Steny H. Hoyer, Hakeem Jeffries, Ben Ray Lujan, Kevin Matthew McCarthy, Gary L. Palmer, Nancy Pelosi and Stephen Joseph Scalise. [20-5016] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 03/02/2020 02:21 PM]

Open Document #2

Fed Ex Envelope

Open Document #1

Envelope 1

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF AND APPENDIX [1829931] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 02/15/2020 ] Length of Brief: 44 Pages. [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:18 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1829924] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 02/15/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:09 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1829921] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 02/15/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:04 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1829919] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:59 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1829918] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 02/15/2020 ] [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:58 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1826525] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/16/2020. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/02/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/02/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/02/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/16/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-5016] [Entered: 01/31/2020 11:19 AM]

Open Document

LETTER [1826520] sent regarding attorney membership to Catherine Abigial Joan Woodbridge for Gavin Newsom. Application for Admission due 03/02/2020. [20-5016] [Entered: 01/31/2020 11:03 AM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1834730] for response [ # 1833754-2 ] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [20-5016] [Entered: 03/23/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1833787] for motion for summary affirmance [ # 1833536-2 ] filed by Gavin Newsom. [20-5016] (Woodbridge, Catherine) [Entered: 03/16/2020 06:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1833754] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1833536-2 ] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 03/16/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 6 pages. [20-5016] [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1833536] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 03/23/2020). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/23/2020) filed by Gavin Newsom (Service Date: 03/13/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: Motion is 932 words or 6 pages; Exhibits A-G attached Bate stamped begin page 7-67. [20-5016] (Woodbridge, Catherine) [Entered: 03/13/2020 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1833116] advising that a brief will not be filed filed by Elizabeth Cheney, James Clyburn, Steny H. Hoyer, Hakeem Jeffries, Ben Ray Lujan, Kevin Matthew McCarthy, Gary L. Palmer, Nancy Pelosi and Stephen Joseph Scalise [Service Date: 03/11/2020 ] [20-5016] (Clouse, Sarah) [Entered: 03/11/2020 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1831569] filed by Gavin Newsom [Service Date: 03/04/2020 ] [20-5016] (Woodbridge, Catherine) [Entered: 03/04/2020 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1831565] filed by Catherine Woodbridge on behalf of Appellee Gavin Newsom. [20-5016] (Woodbridge, Catherine) [Entered: 03/04/2020 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1831697] marked "Return to sender - Insufficient Address - Unable to forward". Certified Mail [1826537-2] had been sent to Party Teresita A. Canuto. [20-5016] [Entered: 03/04/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1831156] filed by Elizabeth Cheney, James Clyburn, Steny H. Hoyer, Hakeem Jeffries, Ben Ray Lujan, Kevin Matthew McCarthy, Gary L. Palmer, Nancy Pelosi and Stephen Joseph Scalise [Service Date: 03/02/2020 ] [20-5016] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 03/02/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1831154] filed by Douglas N. Letter and co-counsel Todd B. Tatelman and Sarah Clouse on behalf of Appellees Elizabeth Cheney, James Clyburn, Steny H. Hoyer, Hakeem Jeffries, Ben Ray Lujan, Kevin Matthew McCarthy, Gary L. Palmer, Nancy Pelosi and Stephen Joseph Scalise. [20-5016] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 03/02/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT BRIEF AND APPENDIX [1829931] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 02/15/2020 ] Length of Brief: 44 Pages. [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1829924] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 02/15/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1829921] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 02/15/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1829919] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1829918] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 02/15/2020 ] [20-5016] [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketFIRST CLASS and CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1826537] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 4285] of order [ # 1826525-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 03/02/2020 from Teresita A. Canuto. [20-5016] [Entered: 01/31/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1826525] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/02/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/16/2020. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/02/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 03/02/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/02/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/16/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-5016] [Entered: 01/31/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER [1826520] sent regarding attorney membership to Catherine Abigial Joan Woodbridge for Gavin Newsom. Application for Admission due 03/02/2020. [20-5016] [Entered: 01/31/2020 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1826512] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01791-JEB filed by Teresita A. Canuto. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5016. [20-5016] [Entered: 01/31/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5016] [Entered: 01/31/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gavin Newsom, Governor of California is a litigant