This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/12/2022 at 06:03:39 (UTC).

Teresa Sykes v. Cook Incorporated, et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Teresa Sykes filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cook Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1844

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TERESA F. SYKES

Defendant / Appellees

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL, LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB, LLP

2425 E. Camelback Road

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Michael E. Gallant

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB STOLLER LLP

1250 Connecticut Avenue

Washington, DC 20036

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at DALIMONTE RUEB, LLP

2425 E. Camelback Road

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian James Paul

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

300 N. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

300 N. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) ORDER issued GRANTING Motion to Maintain Volume Ii of Separate Appendix of Plaintiff-Appellant under Seal. [ # 10 ] The clerks office shall file under seal Volume II of the separate appendix tendered with this motion. SCR [13] [7244627] [22-1844] (AD) [Entered: 06/27/2022 10:38 AM]

#12

(#12) Filed Appendix by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [12] [7243956] Paper copies due on 06/29/2022 [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:40 PM]

#11

(#11) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. Paper copies due on 06/29/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [11] [7243954] [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:39 PM]

10 #2

Volume II of II

10 #1

Motion for leave to file a sealed document

9 #2

Separate Appendix Volume I of II

9 #1

Brief and Appendix of Appellant

#8

(#8) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [8] [7237149] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:20 PM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7237146] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:19 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael E. Gallant for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [6] [7237128] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844][6] [7237128] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/18/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Gallant, Michael) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:59 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jennifer Rethemeier for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [5] [7237127] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] [5] [7237127] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/18/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:56 PM]

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul L. Stoller for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [4] [7237123] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:53 PM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrea Roberts Pierson for Appellees Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC and William Cook Europe APS. [3] [7236426] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] (Pierson, Andrea) [Entered: 05/16/2022 03:00 PM]

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian J. Paul for Appellees Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC and William Cook Europe APS. [2] [7236415] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] [2] [7236415] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/16/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Paul, Brian) [Entered: 05/16/2022 02:55 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#15) Paper copies of appellant brief and appendix vol I and SEALED appendix vol II filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [15] [7244890] [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/28/2022 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SEALED Appendix vol II filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes, per order. [14] [7244637] Paper copies due on 07/05/2022 [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/27/2022 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER issued GRANTING Motion to Maintain Volume Ii of Separate Appendix of Plaintiff-Appellant under Seal. [ # 10 ] The clerks office shall file under seal Volume II of the separate appendix tendered with this motion. SCR [13] [7244627] [22-1844] (AD) [Entered: 06/27/2022 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed Appendix by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [12] [7243956] Paper copies due on 06/29/2022 [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. Paper copies due on 06/29/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [11] [7243954] [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes to seal Volume II of II Separate Appendix. [10] [7243923] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submitted appellant brief by Paul L. Stoller, Jennifer C. Rethemeier and Michael E. Gallant for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [9] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7243922] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [8] [7237149] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7237146] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael E. Gallant for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [6] [7237128] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844][6] [7237128] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/18/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Gallant, Michael) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jennifer Rethemeier for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [5] [7237127] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] [5] [7237127] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/18/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul L. Stoller for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [4] [7237123] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrea Roberts Pierson for Appellees Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC and William Cook Europe APS. [3] [7236426] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] (Pierson, Andrea) [Entered: 05/16/2022 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian J. Paul for Appellees Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC and William Cook Europe APS. [2] [7236415] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] [2] [7236415] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/16/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Paul, Brian) [Entered: 05/16/2022 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes by 05/19/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 05/27/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/22/2022 for Teresa F. Sykes. [1] [7236247] [22-1844] (MM) [Entered: 05/16/2022 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian James Paul