This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/17/2022 at 06:01:59 (UTC).

Teresa Bilkey v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 Teresa Bilkey filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1651

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

TERESA BILKEY

Defendant / Appellant

RELIANCE STANDARD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

William E. Parsons

Attorney at HAWKS QUINDEL, S.C.

409 E. Main Street

Madison, WI 53703

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Edna Sybil Kersting

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

55 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603-5016

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. [2] [7230549] [22-1651] (FP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:19 AM]

#3

(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Tuesday, May 17, 2022 at 2:00pm. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [3] [7232983] [22-1651] (HTP) [Entered: 04/29/2022 03:32 PM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/17/2022 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/18/2022 for Teresa Bilkey. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/08/2022 for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. JB [7232987] [22-1651] (HTP) [Entered: 04/29/2022 03:35 PM]

#5

(#5) AMENDED Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Tuesday, May 17, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [5] [7233334] [22-1651] (CG) [Entered: 05/02/2022 02:03 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee are directed to make a telephonic status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 06/24/2022. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. [7236723] [22-1651] (AP) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:26 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee are directed to make a telephonic status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 06/24/2022. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. [7236723] [22-1651] (AP) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Tuesday, May 17, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [5] [7233334] [22-1651] (CG) [Entered: 05/02/2022 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/17/2022 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/18/2022 for Teresa Bilkey. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/08/2022 for Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. JB [7232987] [22-1651] (HTP) [Entered: 04/29/2022 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Tuesday, May 17, 2022 at 2:00pm. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [3] [7232983] [22-1651] (HTP) [Entered: 04/29/2022 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. [2] [7230549] [22-1651] (FP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/31/2022 for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. [1] [7230543] [22-1651] (FP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edna S. Kersting