Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2021 at 06:04:08 (UTC).

Temple University Hospital v. Secretary United States Dept, et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Temple University Hospital filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Secretary United States Dept. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1293

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

ADMINISTRATOR CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

CHAIRMAN MEDICARE GEOGRAPHIC CLASSIFICATION REVIEW BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joseph D. Glazer Esq.

116 Village Boulevard

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael S. Raab Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Lauren E. DeBruicker Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Thomas Pulham

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Pulham for Appellees Administrator Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Chairman Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. Certificate of Service dated 04/16/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1293] (TP) [Entered: 04/16/2021 04:16 PM]

#20

(#20) Oral Argument Notification for Thursday, 04/29/2021. Setting & Time: Zoom / 9:30am. Location: Remote Participation. (PM) [Entered: 04/15/2021 03:48 PM]

#19

(#19) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellees Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, Administrator Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and Chairman Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board. Certificate of Service dated 04/12/2021 by ECF. [21-1293] (TP) [Entered: 04/12/2021 07:16 PM]

#18

(#18) ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Pulham for Appellees Administrator Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Chairman Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. Certificate of Service dated 03/17/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1293] (TP) [Entered: 03/17/2021 02:54 PM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX Volume II on behalf of Appellant Temple University Hospital. Certificate of service dated 03/11/2021 by ECF. --[Edited 03/12/2021 by EAF - Text edited to specify volume] [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:01 AM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Temple University Hospital. Certificate of Service dated 03/11/2021 by ECF. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 03/11/2021 10:58 AM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Joseph D. Glazer, Esq. for Appellant Temple University Hospital. Certificate of Service dated 03/09/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 03/09/2021 07:02 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Temple University Hospital advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:21 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Temple University Hospital. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:07 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph D. Glazer on behalf of Appellant(s) Temple University Hospital, Inc.. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:47 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary, U.S. Dep't of Health & Human Services; Administrator, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services; Chairman, Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board. [21-1293] (MSR) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:15 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas Pulham on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary, U.S. Dep't of Health & Human Services; Administrator, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services; Chairman, Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board. [21-1293] (TP) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:03 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Memorandum Opinion

#1

Notice of Appeal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Pulham for Appellees Administrator Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Chairman Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. Certificate of Service dated 04/16/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1293] (TP) [Entered: 04/16/2021 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#21) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees Administrator Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Chairman Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services - Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 7. (RM) [Entered: 04/16/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Oral Argument Notification for Thursday, 04/29/2021. Setting & Time: Zoom / 9:30am. Location: Remote Participation. (PM) [Entered: 04/15/2021 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellees Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, Administrator Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and Chairman Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board. Certificate of Service dated 04/12/2021 by ECF. [21-1293] (TP) [Entered: 04/12/2021 07:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Pulham for Appellees Administrator Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Chairman Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. Certificate of Service dated 03/17/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1293] (TP) [Entered: 03/17/2021 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#17) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Temple University Hospital - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). (GPK) [Entered: 03/14/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#16) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Temple University Hospital - Brief with Volume I of Joint Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (KEL) [Entered: 03/12/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX Volume II on behalf of Appellant Temple University Hospital. Certificate of service dated 03/11/2021 by ECF. --[Edited 03/12/2021 by EAF - Text edited to specify volume] [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 03/11/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Temple University Hospital. Certificate of Service dated 03/11/2021 by ECF. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 03/11/2021 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Joseph D. Glazer, Esq. for Appellant Temple University Hospital. Certificate of Service dated 03/09/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 03/09/2021 07:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Temple University Hospital to Expedite Case and briefing. Certificate of Service dated 02/19/2021. Service made by ECF, Email. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/19/2021 11:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Temple University Hospital. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/19/2021 11:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Temple University Hospital. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/19/2021 10:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Temple University Hospital advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Temple University Hospital. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph D. Glazer on behalf of Appellant(s) Temple University Hospital, Inc.. [21-1293] (JDG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary, U.S. Dep't of Health & Human Services; Administrator, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services; Chairman, Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board. [21-1293] (MSR) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas Pulham on behalf of Appellee(s) Secretary, U.S. Dep't of Health & Human Services; Administrator, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services; Chairman, Medicare Geographic Classification Review Board. [21-1293] (TP) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Temple University Hospital in District Court No. 2-20-cv-04533. (AMR) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant

Latest cases where TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL-EPISCOPAL CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER