This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 06:18:07 (UTC).

Temple University Hospital v. NLRB

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 Temple University Hospital filed an Other lawsuit against NLRB. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1111

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Temple University Hospital, Inc.

Respondent

National Labor Relations Board

Intervenor

Temple Allied Professionals, Pennsylvania Association of Staff Nurses and Allied Professional

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Meredith Swartz Dante Esquire

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

Shannon D. Farmer

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

Intervenor Attorney

Jonathan Walters

Attorney at Markowitz & Richman

123 South Broad Street, Suite 2020

Philadelphia, PA 19109

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION [1896612] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] filed by Temple Allied Professionals, Pennsylvania Association of Staff Nurses and Allied Professionals [Service Date: 04/29/2021 ] [21-1111] --[Edited 04/30/2021 by SRJ] (Walters, Jonathan) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:50 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1896476] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 06/14/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 05/28/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 05/28/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 06/14/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 06/14/2021 [21-1111] [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:58 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1896474] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1896470-2 ] [21-1111] [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:53 PM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1896470] of a decision by federal agency filed by Temple University Hospital, Inc. [Service Date: 04/26/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1111] [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:46 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1896612] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] filed by Temple Allied Professionals, Pennsylvania Association of Staff Nurses and Allied Professionals [Service Date: 04/29/2021 ] [21-1111] --[Edited 04/30/2021 by SRJ] (Walters, Jonathan) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1896476] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 05/28/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 06/14/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 05/28/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 05/28/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 06/14/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 06/14/2021 [21-1111] [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1896474] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1896470-2 ] [21-1111] [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1896470] of a decision by federal agency filed by Temple University Hospital, Inc. [Service Date: 04/26/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1111] [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1111] [Entered: 04/28/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL-EPISCOPAL CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases where National Labor Relations Board is a litigant