This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/21/2019 at 06:06:20 (UTC).

Ted McClain v. Cavalry SPV I, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Ted McClain filed an Other lawsuit against Cavalry SPV I, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4030

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TED MCCLAIN

Defendant / Appellees

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Andrew Joseph Gerling

Attorney at Doucet Gerling

655 Metro Place, S., Suite 600

Dublin, OH 43017

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Boyd William Gentry

Attorney at Law Office

4031 Colonel Glenn Highway, First Floor

Beavercreek, OH 45431

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Joseph Gerling for Appellant Ted McClain. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2019. [19-4030] (AJG) [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:14 PM]

#11

(#11) Letter sent by Mediation Office to extend time to file stipulation. Stipulation now due 12/20/2019. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 12/13/2019 09:52 AM]

10 #2

Stipulation to Dismiss

10 #1

Mediator letter sent

#9

(#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Joseph Gerling for Appellant Ted McClain. Certificate of Service:11/05/2019. [19-4030] (AJG) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:32 PM]

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Joseph Gerling for Appellant Ted McClain Certificate of Service: 11/05/2019. [19-4030] (AJG) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:30 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ted McClain by Andrew J. Gerling. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2019. [19-4030] (AJG) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:28 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cavalry SPV I, LLC and Levy & Associates, LLC by Boyd W. Gentry. Certificate of Service: 10/23/2019. [19-4030] (BWG) [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:51 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/13/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:04 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/02/2019; appellee brief due 01/02/2020. (KSF) [Entered: 10/22/2019 11:04 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ted McClain. Transcript needed: n. (KSF) [Entered: 10/22/2019 11:00 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Joseph Gerling for Appellant Ted McClain. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2019. [19-4030] (AJG) [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter sent by Mediation Office to extend time to file stipulation. Stipulation now due 12/20/2019. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 12/13/2019 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a brief or stipulation to dismiss is due 12/13/2019. [Failure to file correctly as instructed in our letter will cause your document to be locked and you will be asked to refile.]. (LMR) [Entered: 11/13/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Joseph Gerling for Appellant Ted McClain. Certificate of Service:11/05/2019. [19-4030] (AJG) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Joseph Gerling for Appellant Ted McClain Certificate of Service: 11/05/2019. [19-4030] (AJG) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ted McClain by Andrew J. Gerling. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2019. [19-4030] (AJG) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cavalry SPV I, LLC and Levy & Associates, LLC by Boyd W. Gentry. Certificate of Service: 10/23/2019. [19-4030] (BWG) [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/13/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • (#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/02/2019; appellee brief due 01/02/2020. (KSF) [Entered: 10/22/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 10/22/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ted McClain. Transcript needed: n. (KSF) [Entered: 10/22/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Levy & Associates, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyd William Gentry