This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/11/2019 at 06:06:42 (UTC).

Tecnocap, LLC v. United Steel, Paper and Forest

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Tecnocap, LLC filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against United Steel, Paper and Forest. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1263

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL & SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION AFL-CIO/CLC, Local Union No. 152M

Plaintiff / Appellant

TECNOCAP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Timothy F. Cogan

Attorney at CASSIDY, COGAN, SHAPELL & VOEGELIN, LC

1413 Eoff Street

Wheeling, WV 26003-0000

Maneesh Sharma

Attorney at UNITED STEELWORKERS OF AMERICA

60 Boulevard Of The Allies

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Bradley K. Shafer Esq.

Attorney at MINTZER SAROWITZ ZERIS LEDVA & MEYERS, LLP

48 14Th Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 11 ] by Tecnocap, LLC. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [276]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 05/07/2019. [1000510217] [19-1263] RHS [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 10 ] by Tecnocap, LLC. Number of pages: [30]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 05/07/2019. [1000510216] [19-1263] RHS [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Tecnocap, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 05/06/2019. [1000507304] [19-1263] Bradley Shafer [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF by Tecnocap, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/06/2019. [1000507303] [19-1263] Bradley Shafer [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1263] MRB [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/06/2019. Response Brief due 06/04/2019 [19-1263] RHS [Entered: 03/26/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Tecnocap, LLC. [19-1263] Bradley Shafer [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Tecnocap, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000482096] [19-1263] Bradley Shafer [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bradley K. Shafer for Tecnocap, LLC. [1000482093] [19-1263] Bradley Shafer [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial & Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO/CLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000477469] [19-1263] Maneesh Sharma [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Maneesh Sharma for United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial & Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO/CLC. [1000477466] [19-1263] Maneesh Sharma [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00156-JPB.. [19-1263] RHS [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-00156-JPB. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1263] RHS [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tecnocap LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO-CLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley K. Shafer