This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2019 at 06:07:05 (UTC).

Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC v. Alixa Rx LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alixa Rx LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1488

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

FILLMORE STRATEGIC MANAGEMENT, LLC

FILLMORE STRATEGIC INVESTORS, LLC

Cross Appellant

TECH PHARMACY SERVICES, LLC

Defendant / Appellants

FILLMORE CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC

GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, dba Golden LivingCenters

ALIXA RX LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Appellant Attorneys

Jessica Lynn Ellsworth Esq.

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

Columbia Square, 555 Thirteenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Kirti Datla

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

555 13Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1109

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael A. Bittner Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2501 N Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Thomas M. Melsheimer

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

2121 N Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Steffen Nathanael Johnson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1700 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MOTION of Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care to extend the time to 05/01/2019 to file the Appellants to file their opening brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/05/2019 by email. [590435] [19-1488] [Michael Bittner] [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:55 PM]

#16

(#16) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586139] [19-1488] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:38 PM]

#15

(#15) Entry of appearance for Thomas M. Melsheimer as of counsel for Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586035] [19-1488] [Thomas Melsheimer] [Entered: 02/14/2019 02:12 PM]

#14

(#14) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585955] [19-1488] [Michael Bittner] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:45 PM]

#13

(#13) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585953] [19-1488] [Michael Bittner] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:42 PM]

#12

(#12) Entry of appearance for Michael A. Bittner as of counsel for Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585951] [19-1488] [Michael Bittner] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:40 PM]

#11

(#11) Entry of appearance for Steffen N. Johnson as principal counsel for Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585944] [19-1488] [Steffen Johnson] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:25 PM]

#10

(#10) Corrected Entry of appearance for Kirti Datla as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/07/2019 by email. [584054] [19-1488] [Kirti Datla] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:41 AM]

#9

(#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Jessica L. Ellsworth as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/07/2019 by email. [584047] [19-1488] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:35 AM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC, Entries of Appearance - J. Ellsworth, K. Datla [ # 4 ], [ # 7 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 02/14/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[584019] [JAL] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:07 AM]

#7

(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC, Entries of Appearance - J. Ellsworth, K. Datla [ # 4 ], [ # 7 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 02/14/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[584019] [JAL] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:07 AM]

#6

(#6) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583744] [19-1488] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:41 AM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583740] [19-1488] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:37 AM]

#4

(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC, Entries of Appearance - J. Ellsworth, K. Datla [ # 4 ], [ # 7 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 02/14/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[584019] [JAL] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:07 AM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • (#20) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a)and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [592419] [JAL] [Entered: 03/13/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to extend time to file brief Docket No. [ # 17 ], ERROR: Appellants' motion [ # 17 ] did not contain: (1) The correct caption for this case. The use of "et al" is not allowed. (2) A complete certificate of interest. Statement 5 appears to be missing. (3) A certificate of compliance with the word count. CORRECTION: For future motions, pursuant to FRAP 32(g)(1) and FCR 47.3, please include the listed items. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [590893] [JAL] [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 17 ] filed by Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Golden Gate National Senior Care, and Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC. Appellants' opening brief is due 05/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [590892] [JAL] [Entered: 03/06/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION of Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care to extend the time to 05/01/2019 to file the Appellants to file their opening brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/05/2019 by email. [590435] [19-1488] [Michael Bittner] [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586139] [19-1488] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Entry of appearance for Thomas M. Melsheimer as of counsel for Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [586035] [19-1488] [Thomas Melsheimer] [Entered: 02/14/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585955] [19-1488] [Michael Bittner] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585953] [19-1488] [Michael Bittner] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Entry of appearance for Michael A. Bittner as of counsel for Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585951] [19-1488] [Michael Bittner] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Steffen N. Johnson as principal counsel for Appellants Alixa Rx LLC, Fillmore Capital Partners, LLC and Golden Gate National Senior Care. Service: 02/14/2019 by email. [585944] [19-1488] [Steffen Johnson] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corrected Entry of appearance for Kirti Datla as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/07/2019 by email. [584054] [19-1488] [Kirti Datla] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Jessica L. Ellsworth as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/07/2019 by email. [584047] [19-1488] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC, Entries of Appearance - J. Ellsworth, K. Datla [ # 4 ], [ # 7 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 02/14/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[584019] [JAL] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Kirti Datla as of counsel for Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583850] [19-1488] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Kirti Datla] [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583744] [19-1488] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583740] [19-1488] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Jessica L. Ellsworth as principal counsel for Cross-Appellant Tech Pharmacy Services, LLC. Service: 02/06/2019 by email. [583738] [19-1488] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Jessica Ellsworth] [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • (#3) Official caption revised to reflect cross-appeal 19-1489. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [582330] [JAL] [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • (#2) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 19-1488 Lead with 19-1489 Cross-Appeal. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [582323] [19-1488, 19-1489] [JAL] [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/30/2019. [582313] Entry of Appearance due 02/14/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/14/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/14/2019. Appellant's brief is due 04/01/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less