This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:20 (UTC).

TDY Holdings, LLC, et al v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 TDY Holdings, LLC filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55804

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

TDY HOLDINGS, LLC

TDY INDUSTRIES, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

PATRICK SHANAHAN, Secretary of Defense

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Joseph Dragna

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Randall M. Levine

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Bryan Michael Killian

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michelle Lambert

Attorney at DOJ-Office of the U.S. Attorney

700 Stewart Street

Seattle, WA 98101

Robert H. Foster

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

1961 Stout Street

Denver, CO 80294

Rachel E. Heron

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11419728] [19-55804, 19-55858] (CL) [Entered: 09/04/2019 07:00 AM]

10 #2

Exhibit A

10 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 08/07/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11373920] (VS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:45 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/19/2019. [11369847] [19-55804] (Levine, Randall) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:00 PM]

#2

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellants DOD, Patrick Shanahan and USA in 19-55858, Appellees DOD, Patrick Shanahan and USA in 19-55804 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/02/2019. [11384972] [19-55858, 19-55804] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 08/02/2019 07:15 AM]

1 #4

Cross Appeal Chart

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11419728] [19-55804, 19-55858] (CL) [Entered: 09/04/2019 07:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • (#12) Streamlined request [11] by Appellants TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC in 19-55804 to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: First cross appeal brief due 11/22/2019 for TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC. Second brief on cross appeal due 12/23/2019 for Patrick Shanahan, United States Department of Defense and United States of America. Third brief on cross appeal due 01/22/2020 for TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for USA parties is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. . [11389187] [19-55804, 19-55858] (DLM) [Entered: 08/06/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • (#11) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC in 19-55804. New requested due date is 11/22/2019. [11388351] [19-55804, 19-55858] (Levine, Randall) [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) Appellants TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC in 19-55804 Correspondence: Notice that no transcripts will be ordered. Date of service: 08/06/2019 [11388318] [19-55804, 19-55858] (Levine, Randall) [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • (#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/02/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11385441][19-55804] (AD) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Appellants DOD, Patrick Shanahan and USA in 19-55858, Appellees DOD, Patrick Shanahan and USA in 19-55804 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/02/2019. [11384972] [19-55858, 19-55804] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 08/02/2019 07:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/02/2019. First cross appeal brief due 10/23/2019 for TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC. Second brief on cross appeal due 11/25/2019 for Patrick Shanahan, United States Department of Defense and United States of America. Third brief on cross appeal due 12/26/2019 for TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for USA parties is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11378196] [19-55858, 19-55804] (RT) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 08/07/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11373920] (VS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/19/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11370457][19-55804] (AD) [Entered: 07/19/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/19/2019. [11369847] [19-55804] (Levine, Randall) [Entered: 07/19/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#3) Added Attorney(s) Rachel E. Heron for party(s) Appellee Patrick Shanahan Appellee USA Appellee DOD, in case 19-55804. [11364281] (CW) [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rachel Eileen Heron (U.S. Department of Justice, ENRD, Appellate Section; P.O. Box 7415; Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees DOD, Patrick Shanahan and USA. Date of service: 07/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11364276] [19-55804] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/22/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/14/2019. Transcript due 09/13/2019. Appellants TDY Holdings, LLC and TDY Industries, LLC opening brief due 10/23/2019. Appellees Patrick Shanahan, United States Department of Defense and United States of America answering brief due 11/25/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11364046] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.