This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 06:04:51 (UTC).

Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) v. Brian Foster

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Tayr K Al Ghashiyah Khan filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Brian Foster. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2922

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

TAYR K. AL GHASHIYAH (KHAN), also known as John Casteel

Waupun, WI 53963-0000

Respondent / Appellee

BRIAN FOSTER, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan)

Attorney at WAUPUN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 351

Waupun, WI 53963-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Scott Rosenow

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Mandate

Open Document #1

Certified copy sent

13 #2

Mandate

13 #1

Final Order with Mandate

#12

(#12) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [12] [7038784] [19-2922] (CG) [Entered: 10/23/2019 02:59 PM]

#11

(#11) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) in 19-2922, 19-2957 leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 10/20/2019. [11] [7038303] [19-2922, 19-2957] (CG) [Entered: 10/22/2019 08:56 AM]

#10

(#10) Notice of common law objections filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan). [10] [7038199] [19-2922] (AG) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:13 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER: On consideration of the Motion to Consolidate filed by appellant on October 15, 2019, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. See courts order of October 10, 2019, requiring appellant to explain why two appeals are necessary; and if not, requiring appellant to dismiss one or the other. [ # 7 ] DW [9] [7037665] [19-2922] (VG) [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:23 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed letter from Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan). [8] [7037003] [19-2922] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:13 PM]

#7

(#7) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) to consolidate. [7] [7037002] [19-2922, 19-2957] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:11 PM]

#6

(#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) for appointment of counsel. [6] [7037000] [19-2922] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:09 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan). Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7035078] [19-2922] (JR) [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:51 PM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: On consideration of the petitioners notice for interlocutory appeal and the district courts September 30, 2019 decision and order, this appeal shall proceed to a determination whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Briefing in this appeal shall be SUSPENDED until further court order. JR [7034898] [19-2922] (CG) [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:06 PM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

State Habeas/Appealability Denied Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 10/24/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7038961-2] [7038961] [19-2922] (PS) [Entered: 10/24/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER re: Motion for voluntary dismissal. This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 12 ][13][7038954] [19-2922] (PS) [Entered: 10/24/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [12] [7038784] [19-2922] (CG) [Entered: 10/23/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) in 19-2922, 19-2957 leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 10/20/2019. [11] [7038303] [19-2922, 19-2957] (CG) [Entered: 10/22/2019 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of common law objections filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan). [10] [7038199] [19-2922] (AG) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: On consideration of the Motion to Consolidate filed by appellant on October 15, 2019, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. See courts order of October 10, 2019, requiring appellant to explain why two appeals are necessary; and if not, requiring appellant to dismiss one or the other. [ # 7 ] DW [9] [7037665] [19-2922] (VG) [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed letter from Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan). [8] [7037003] [19-2922] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) to consolidate. [7] [7037002] [19-2922, 19-2957] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) for appointment of counsel. [6] [7037000] [19-2922] (MM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#5) Notification from the District Court that a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis was filed on 10/11/2019 and is pending. [5] [7036690] [19-2922, 19-2957] (JR) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan), also known as John Casteel, shall file, on or before October 23, 2019, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed as unnecessary. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) DW [7036012][4]. [4] [7036012] [19-2922] (PS) [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan). Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7035078] [19-2922] (JR) [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: On consideration of the petitioners notice for interlocutory appeal and the district courts September 30, 2019 decision and order, this appeal shall proceed to a determination whether a certificate of appealability should issue. Briefing in this appeal shall be SUSPENDED until further court order. JR [7034898] [19-2922] (CG) [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied on 09/30/2019. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 10/16/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan) by 10/09/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/12/2019 for Tayr K. Al Ghashiyah (Khan). [1] [7034362] [19-2922]--[Updated 10/04/2019 by JR.] (FP) [Entered: 10/03/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less