This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/05/2020 at 06:03:10 (UTC).

Taylor Trail v. Utility Trailer Manufacturing

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Taylor Trail filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Utility Trailer Manufacturing. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1525

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TAYLOR WAYNE TRAIL

Defendant / Appellee

UTILITY TRAILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Linda Leigh Rhoads Strelka

Attorney at STRELKA LAW OFFICE, PC

119 Norfolk Avenue, Sw

Roanoke, VA 24011

Norvell Winston West IV

Attorney at STRELKA LAW OFFICE, PC

119 Norfolk Avenue, Sw

Roanoke, VA 24011

Thomas Eugene Strelka

Attorney at STRELKA LAW OFFICE, PC

119 Norfolk Avenue, Sw

Roanoke, VA 24011

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Mark Mitchell Lawson

Attorney at ELLIOTT, LAWSON & MINOR, PC

110 Piedmont Avenue

Bristol, VA 24201-4159

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

7 #1

Docketing statement (civil/agency)

7 #2

Additional Document

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 07/29/2020. Response brief due 08/28/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000751371] [20-1525] RJL [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/29/2020. Response Brief due 07/29/2020. [20-1525] RJL [Entered: 05/20/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1525] MRB [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Taylor Wayne Trail. [20-1525] Thomas Strelka [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taylor Wayne Trail. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000742094] [20-1525] Thomas Strelka [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Thomas E. Strelka for Taylor Wayne Trail. [1000742092] [20-1525] Thomas Strelka [Entered: 05/20/2020 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark M. Lawson for Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company. [1000738543] [20-1525] Mark Lawson [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000738540] [20-1525] Mark Lawson [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00037-JPJ-PMS. Mailed to: Mark Lawson. [20-1525] RJL [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00037-JPJ-PMS. Case manager: Rachel Lee. [20-1525] RJL [Entered: 05/06/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UTILITY TRAILER MANUFACTURING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant