This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/25/2022 at 06:21:05 (UTC).

Tavares Farrington v. Diah, et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Tavares Farrington filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Diah,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-13281

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TAVARES LENARD FARRINGTON

Thomson, IL 61285

Defendant / Appellees

DIAH

M. BROWN

CHAMBERS

WISE

MERENO

GILLARD

CHARD

JONES

OLIVER

DUNNS

HORNE

WEAVER

LOPER

BROWNFIELD

THURMAN

DOSS

MARAIRE

SCHIMST

WESTBROOK

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tavares Lenard Farrington

Attorney at USP Thomson - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 1002

Thomson, IL 61285

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

USDC Judgment DE# 22

Open Document #4

USDC Order DE# 21

Open Document

Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Party Tavares Lenard Farrington. [Entered: 10/13/2022 03:23 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Tavares Lenard Farrington. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 10/24/2022 03:24 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Tavares Lenard Farrington. [Entered: 11/01/2022 07:55 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Tavares Lenard Farrington. [Entered: 11/08/2022 11:07 AM]

Open Document

Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Party Tavares Lenard Farrington. [Entered: 11/08/2022 12:25 PM]

Open Document #1

USDC Order or Motion on Fees (PLRA)

Open Document #2

PLRA-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC Order Granting appellant Leave to Proceed with Fees NOT Assessed. Filed on 11/08/2022. Docket Entry 35. [Entered: 11/21/2022 11:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Appeal filed by Party Tavares Lenard Farrington. [Entered: 11/08/2022 12:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Tavares Lenard Farrington. [Entered: 11/08/2022 11:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Tavares Lenard Farrington. [Entered: 11/01/2022 07:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Tavares Lenard Farrington. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 10/24/2022 03:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Appeal filed by Party Tavares Lenard Farrington. [Entered: 10/13/2022 03:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Tavares Lenard Farrington on 09/23/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid.. [Entered: 10/06/2022 09:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Loper is a litigant

Latest cases where Brownfield is a litigant

Latest cases where GILLARD is a litigant

Latest cases where Doss is a litigant