This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/19/2021 at 06:15:33 (UTC).

Tatyana Drevaleva v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Tatyana Drevaleva filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against USA,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15694

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

PHIL JOHNSON, in his individual capacity as an Assistant Manager of 5D of the Ramond G. Murphy VAMC

CARLA DUNKELBERGER, in her individual capacity as a manager of 5D of the Raymond G. Murphy VAMC

Plaintiff / Appellant

TATYANA EVGENIEVNA DREVALEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Additional Document

2 #3

Additional Document

2 #4

Additional Document

#3

4 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Additional Document

5 #1

Main Document

5 #2

Additional Document

5 #3

Additional Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#6) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-15694: IFP Pending In COA] ). [12127211] (NAC) [Entered: 05/27/2021 03:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Form 4). Date of service: 05/27/2021. [12127200] [21-15694] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 05/27/2021 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva response to order to show cause dated 04/28/2021. Date of service: 05/27/2021. [12126997] [21-15694] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 05/27/2021 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12090131] (NAC) [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has denied appellant leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [12089984] (CKP) [Entered: 04/28/2021 01:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva opening brief due 06/22/2021. [12081312] (RT) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less