This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:54 (UTC).

Tatyana Drevaleva v. United States Department of Ve, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Tatyana Drevaleva filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against United States Department of Ve. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16395

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ROBERT WILKIE, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

PETER O'ROURKE, Acting United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs

Plaintiff / Appellant

TATYANA EVGENIEVNA DREVALEVA

Daly City, CA 94015

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Claire Truxaw Cormier Esquire

Attorney at DOJ - Office of the U.S. Attorney

150 Almaden Boulevard, Suite 900

San Jose, CA 95113

Kimberly Robinson

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

450 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva

1063 Gilman Dr.

Daly City, CA 94015

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva reply to response (motion for summary reversal). Date of service: 09/11/2019. [11428971] [19-16395] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 09/11/2019 06:25 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees United States Department of Veterans Affairs and Robert Wilkie response to motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/05/2019. [11422507] [19-16395] (Robinson, Kimberly) [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:46 PM]

5 #8

Additional Document

5 #7

Additional Document

5 #6

Additional Document

#5

Additional Document

5 #4

Additional Document

5 #3

Additional Document

5 #2

Additional Document

5 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) Received copy of District Court order filed on 08/14/2019. This order finds that Appellant may proceed in forma pauperis on her pending appeal. [11402222] (NAC) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:10 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11395558] (CKP) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:54 AM]

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11389482] (NAC) [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:09 AM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva reply to response (motion for summary reversal). Date of service: 09/11/2019. [11428971] [19-16395] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 09/11/2019 06:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellees United States Department of Veterans Affairs and Robert Wilkie response to motion ([ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 09/05/2019. [11422507] [19-16395] (Robinson, Kimberly) [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva Motion for summary reversal. Date of service: 09/01/2019. [11417820] [19-16395] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 09/01/2019 10:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Received copy of District Court order filed on 08/14/2019. This order finds that Appellant may proceed in forma pauperis on her pending appeal. [11402222] (NAC) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11395558] (CKP) [Entered: 08/13/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11389482] (NAC) [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 08/12/2019. Transcript due 09/11/2019. Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva opening brief due 10/21/2019. Appellees Peter O'Rourke, United States Department of Veterans Affairs and Robert Wilkie answering brief due 11/21/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11363934] (RT) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less