This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/26/2021 at 06:15:28 (UTC).

Tatyana Drevaleva v. Jim Humes, et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Tatyana Drevaleva filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Jim Humes. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15765

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JIM HUMES, Chief Justice of the California Court of Appeal for the First District

NOEL WISE, Judge of the Superior Court of Alameda County

NARAYAN TRAVELSTEAD PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

ALAMEDA HEALTH SYSTEM

Plaintiff / Appellant

TATYANA EVGENIEVNA DREVALEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva

 

Court Documents

10 #4

Additional Document

10 #3

Additional Document

10 #2

Additional Document

10 #1

Main Document

9 #3

Additional Document

9 #2

Additional Document

9 #1

Main Document

8 #4

Additional Document

8 #3

Additional Document

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

Main Document

#7

6 #2

Additional Document

6 #1

Main Document

5 #4

Additional Document

5 #3

Additional Document

5 #2

Additional Document

5 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Form 4). Date of service: 06/24/2021. [12153996] [21-15765] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 06/24/2021 06:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva EMERGENCY Motion for miscellaneous relief [To disqualify the Narayan Travelstead Professional Law Corporation from representing Defendant the Alameda Health System.]. Date of service: 06/24/2021. [12153981] [21-15765] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 06/24/2021 05:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva response to order to show cause dated 04/30/2021. Date of service: 06/24/2021. [12153435] [21-15765] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): Appellants motion for an extension of time [ # 6 ] to respond to this courts April 30, 2021 order is granted. Appellant shall file a response on or before June 25, 2021. Failure to comply with this order will result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute under Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing remains stayed pending further order of the court. [12131246] (CKP) [Entered: 06/02/2021 01:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva EMERGENCY Motion to extend time to file a response until 06/24/2021. Date of service: 05/31/2021. [12128898] [21-15765] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 05/31/2021 08:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [12098878] (CKP) [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#4) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-15765: Due] ). [12098140] (DJV) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received copy of District Court order filed on 04/29/2021 in forma pauperis revoked . [12098138] (DJV) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [12090180] (CKP) [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva opening brief due 06/28/2021. [12089011] (RT) [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less