This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/26/2021 at 06:15:18 (UTC).

Tatyana Drevaleva v. Jim Humes, et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Tatyana Drevaleva filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jim Humes,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15764

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TATYANA EVGENIEVNA DREVALEVA

Defendant / Appellees

JIM HUMES, The Honorable; Chief Justice of the California Court of Appeal for the First District

PAUL D. HERBERT, The Honorable; Judge of the Superior Court of Alameda County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #2

Additional Document

12 #1

Main Document

#11

9 #2

Additional Document

9 #1

Main Document

8 #3

Additional Document

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

Main Document

7 #9

Additional Document

7 #8

Additional Document

#7

Additional Document

7 #6

Additional Document

7 #5

Additional Document

7 #4

Additional Document

7 #3

Additional Document

7 #2

Additional Document

7 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): Appellants request to correct a clerical mistake (Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]) is granted. The order entered in this docket on May 26, 2021 (Docket Entry No. [ # 11 ]) is vacated as issued in error. Appellants motion for an extension of time filed in appeal No. 21-15657 will be addressed by separate order in that docket. Briefing in this appeal No. 21-15764 remains stayed pending disposition of the May 5, 2021 order to show case and appellants pending motions. [12128439] (JBS) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva EMERGENCY Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Correct a Clerical Mistake.]. Date of service: 05/27/2021. [12126275] [21-15764] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 05/27/2021 08:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): Appellants motion for an extension of time [ # 8 ] to respond to this courts April 26, 2021 order is granted. Appellant shall file a response on or before June 30, 2021. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute under Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is stayed pending further order of the court. [12124710] (CKP) [Entered: 05/26/2021 07:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#10) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-15764: IFP Pending In COA] ). [12114668] (QDL) [Entered: 05/17/2021 09:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva EMERGENCY Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to assign a panel to process my appeal]. Date of service: 05/15/2021. [12114258] [21-15764] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 5/17/2021 by TYL] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 05/15/2021 12:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Form 4). Date of service: 05/15/2021. [12114256] [21-15764] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 05/15/2021 11:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva response to order to show cause dated 05/05/2021. Date of service: 05/15/2021. [12114255] [21-15764] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 05/15/2021 10:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is frivolous and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [12103603] (CKP) [Entered: 05/05/2021 04:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#5) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-15764: Due] ). [12098131] (DJV) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received copy of District Court order filed on 04/29/2021 in forma pauperis revoked . [12098126] (DJV) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [12090173] (CKP) [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-15764: IFP] ). [12088964] (RT) [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva opening brief due 06/28/2021. [12088952] (RT) [Entered: 04/27/2021 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less