This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/27/2020 at 06:11:12 (UTC).

Tatyana Drevaleva v. Department of Veterans Affairs, et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Tatyana Drevaleva filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Department of Veterans Affairs,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-17126

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ROBERT WILKIE, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs

DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

PETER O'ROURKE, Acting United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs

Plaintiff / Appellant

TATYANA EVGENIEVNA DREVALEVA

San Francisco, CA 94121

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Claire Truxaw Cormier Esquire

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

70 West Hedding Street, East Wing, 9Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

Kimberly Robinson

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

450 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva

3015 Clement St.

San Francisco, CA 94121

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #11

Additional Document

3 #10

Additional Document

3 #9

Additional Document

3 #8

Additional Document

3 #7

Additional Document

3 #6

Additional Document

3 #5

Additional Document

3 #4

Additional Document

#3

Additional Document

3 #2

Additional Document

3 #1

Main Document

#2

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellees Robert Wilkie and Department of Veterans Affairs reply to response to Court order dated 11/24/2020. Date of service: 12/10/2020. [11923150] [20-17126] (Robinson, Kimberly) [Entered: 12/10/2020 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva response to Court order dated 11/24/2020. Date of service: 12/03/2020. [11913898] [20-17126] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 12/03/2020 11:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MN): The district court entered judgment in this action on July 7, 2019. Appellant appealed this judgment in appeal No. 19-16395. On September 2, 2020, the district court issued an order denying appellants motion for written indication under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1, for relief from the district courts September 3, 2019 post-judgment order determining that no further filings would be entertained in the action, and to compel defendants to respond to several post-judgment supplemental briefs filed by appellant after the district courts no further filings order was entered. Appellant appealed the district courts September 2, 2020 post-judgment order in the instant appeal, No. 20-17126. On November 18, 2020, this court issued a memorandum disposition in appeal No. 19-16395 affirming in part and reversing in part the district courts July 7, 2019 judgment, and remanding for further proceedings. This appeal may therefore be moot. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed as moot in light of this courts disposition in appeal No. 19-16395. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. Failure to comply with this order will result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11905498] (WL) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva reply to response (motion for injunction pending appeal, motion to expedite case). Date of service: 11/12/2020. [11891466] [20-17126] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Department of Veterans Affairs response opposing motion ([ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 11/06/2020. [11884549] [20-17126] (Robinson, Kimberly) [Entered: 11/06/2020 11:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva EMERGENCY Motion for injunction pending appeal. Date of service: 11/01/2020. [11878087] [20-17126] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 11/01/2020 06:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva Urgent Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 10/28/2020. [11874214] [20-17126] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 10/28/2020 11:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 11/27/2020. Transcript due 12/28/2020. Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva opening brief due 02/04/2021. Appellees Department of Veterans Affairs, Peter O'Rourke and Robert Wilkie answering brief due 03/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11874037] (RT) [Entered: 10/28/2020 10:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less