This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/19/2021 at 06:15:13 (UTC).

Tatyana Drevaleva v. Department of Veterans Affairs

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Tatyana Drevaleva filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Department of Veterans Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15692

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

Plaintiff / Appellant

TATYANA EVGENIEVNA DREVALEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kimberly Robinson

Adrienne Zack

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellee Department of Veterans Affairs reply to response to order to show cause dated 05/05/2021. Date of service: 06/17/2021. [12147959] [21-15692] (Zack, Adrienne) [Entered: 06/17/2021 07:09 PM]

8 #3

Additional Document

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

Main Document

7 #4

Additional Document

7 #3

Additional Document

7 #2

Additional Document

7 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Additional Document

3 #1

Order

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/13/2021. [12081264] (RT) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:38 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellee Department of Veterans Affairs reply to response to order to show cause dated 05/05/2021. Date of service: 06/17/2021. [12147959] [21-15692] (Zack, Adrienne) [Entered: 06/17/2021 07:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Form 4). Date of service: 06/09/2021. [12139771] [21-15692] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 06/09/2021 09:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva response to order to show cause dated 05/05/2021. Date of service: 06/09/2021. [12139769] [21-15692] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 06/09/2021 09:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva EMERGENCY Motion to extend time to file a response until 06/24/2021. Date of service: 05/31/2021. [12128906] [21-15692] (Drevaleva, Tatyana) [Entered: 05/31/2021 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Kimberly Robinson in 21-15692 substituted by Attorney Adrienne Zack in 21-15692 [12109986] (NAC) [Entered: 05/12/2021 07:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adrienne Marie Zack (U.S. Attorney's Office, Northern District of California, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 9th Fl., San Francisco, CA 94102) for Appellee Department of Veterans Affairs. Substitution for Attorney Kimberly Robinson for Appellee Department of Veterans Affairs. Date of service: 05/11/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12109862] [21-15692] (Zack, Adrienne) [Entered: 05/11/2021 05:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed order (Interim Appellate Commissioner: Lisa B. Fitzgerald):: Appellants April 13, 2021 notice of appeal challenges the district courts judgment entered on December 19, 2019, and the district courts post-judgment order entered on March 26, 2021. Appellant filed a previous appeal of the district courts September 20, 2019 judgment, appeal No. 20-15374. The mandate for appeal No. 20-15374 issued on March 11, 2021. The portion of the notice of appeal challenging the December 19, 2019 judgment is duplicative of closed appeal No. 20-15374. Accordingly, the scope of this appeal is limited to a review of the district courts March 26, 2021 post-judgment order. A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has denied appellant leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). CO/Pro Se 2 Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellee may file a response within 10 days after service of appellants statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk will serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, and (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal or statement that the appeal should go forward. [12103247] (RT) [Entered: 05/05/2021 02:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/13/2021. [12081264] (RT) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva opening brief due 06/22/2021. Appellee Department of Veterans Affairs answering brief due 07/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12081242] (RT) [Entered: 04/20/2021 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less