This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/04/2021 at 06:07:10 (UTC).

Tattersalls LTD., et al v. Gerald Wiener, et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Tattersalls LTD filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Gerald Wiener. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56166

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TATTERSALLS LTD., Incorporated in England

Appellants

THE LAW OFFICES OF DIANA L. COURTEAU, APC

P.O. Box 2022

El Segundo, CA 90245

DIANA L. COURTEAU, former counsel for plaintiff

El Segundo, CA 90245

DIANA COURTEAU, former counsel for plaintiff

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendants

THE PREMAE CO. LLC, a corporation

JEFFREY J. DEHAVEN, an individual

Defendant / Appellees

FINANCE CALIFORNIA, INC., a corporation

GERALD WIENER, an individual, a partner, AKA Gerald H. Wiener

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

The Law Offices of Diana L. Courteau, APC

Attorney at Courteau & Associates

P.O. Box 2022

El Segundo, CA 90245

Diana L. Courteau

Attorney at Courteau & Associates

P.O. Box 2022

El Segundo, CA 90245

Diana Courteau

Attorney at Courteau & Associates

P.O. Box 2022

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas W. McNamara

Attorney at McNamara Smith LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1680

San Diego, CA 92101

Sanjay Bhandari

Attorney at McNamara Smith LLP

655 West Broadway, Suite 1680

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/29/2020, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11912003] (VS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 09:10 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The November 3, 2020 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending October 22, 2020 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellants shall file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellants intend to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellants must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11888491] (CKP) [Entered: 11/10/2020 01:30 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants The Law Offices of Diana L. Courteau, APC and Diana Courteau Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/09/2020. [11885907] [20-56166] (Courteau, Diana) [Entered: 11/09/2020 09:37 AM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/29/2020, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11912003] (VS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The November 3, 2020 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending October 22, 2020 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellants shall file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellants intend to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellants must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11888491] (CKP) [Entered: 11/10/2020 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/09/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11886487]. [20-56166] (AD) [Entered: 11/09/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants The Law Offices of Diana L. Courteau, APC and Diana Courteau Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/09/2020. [11885907] [20-56166] (Courteau, Diana) [Entered: 11/09/2020 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 12/03/2020. Transcript due 01/04/2021. Appellants Diana L. Courteau and The Law Offices of Diana L. Courteau, APC opening brief due 02/11/2021. Appellees Finance California, Inc. and Gerald Wiener answering brief due 03/15/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11883396] (RT) [Entered: 11/05/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCE CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W McNamara

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sanjay Bhandari