Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2019 at 06:05:59 (UTC).

Taryn Serra-Cruz v. CCL, et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Taryn Serra-Cruz filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against CCL. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-13725

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellees

CARNIVAL CORPORATION

XYZ CORPORATION(S)

WILD PLAY ADVENTURE WPAD SRL

Plaintiff / Appellant

TARYN SERRA-CRUZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Carlos Javier Chardon

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se 2Nd Ave Fl 12

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey Eric Foreman

Attorney at Foreman Friedman, PA

2 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33131-1803

Noah D. Silverman

Attorney at Foreman Friedman, PA

2 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 2300

Miami, FL 33131-1803

Michael John Dono

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se 2Nd Ave Fl 12

Miami, FL 33131

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jason Robert Margulies

Attorney at Law Office of Jason Margulies

7745 Sw 139 Terr

Pine Crest, FL 33158

Jacqueline Garcell

Attorney at Lipcon Margulies Alsina & Winkleman, PA

One Biscayne Tower Ste 1776, 2 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

Luis Alexander Perez

Attorney at Lipcon Margulies Alsina & Winkleman, PA

One Biscayne Tower Ste 1776, 2 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 12/30/2019 filed by Taryn Serra-Cruz. Motion is Unopposed. [8909939-1] [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:48 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason Margulies for Taryn Serra-Cruz Jason Robert Margulies for Taryn Serra-Cruz. [19-13725] (ECF: Jason Margulies) [Entered: 10/15/2019 01:36 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jacqueline Garcell for Taryn Serra-Cruz Jacqueline Garcell for Taryn Serra-Cruz. [19-13725] (ECF: Jacqueline Garcell) [Entered: 10/15/2019 01:08 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Michael John Dono for Wild Play Adventure WPAD SRL. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13725] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 10/11/2019 01:24 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael John Dono for Wild Play Adventure WPAD SRL [19-13725] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 10/10/2019 06:45 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Luis Alexander Perez for Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/03/2019 11:08 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Luis Alexander Perez for Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz. [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/03/2019 11:04 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by L. Alex Perez for Taryn Serra-Cruz. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:05 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by L. Alex Perez for Taryn Serra-Cruz [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:01 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 09/20/2019 as to Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz. [Entered: 09/23/2019 12:47 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #58

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz is GRANTED. [ # 8909939-2 ] Appellants brief due on 12/30/2019, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. KCN [Entered: 10/24/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Michael John Dono for Wild Play Adventure WPAD SRL. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 10/21/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jeffrey Eric Foreman for CCL and Noah D. Silverman for CCL. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 10/21/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 12/30/2019 filed by Taryn Serra-Cruz. Motion is Unopposed. [8909939-1] [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason Margulies for Taryn Serra-Cruz Jason Robert Margulies for Taryn Serra-Cruz. [19-13725] (ECF: Jason Margulies) [Entered: 10/15/2019 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jacqueline Garcell for Taryn Serra-Cruz Jacqueline Garcell for Taryn Serra-Cruz. [19-13725] (ECF: Jacqueline Garcell) [Entered: 10/15/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Michael John Dono for Wild Play Adventure WPAD SRL. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13725] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 10/11/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael John Dono for Wild Play Adventure WPAD SRL [19-13725] (ECF: Michael Dono) [Entered: 10/10/2019 06:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Luis Alexander Perez for Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/03/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Luis Alexander Perez for Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz. [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/03/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by L. Alex Perez for Taryn Serra-Cruz. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by L. Alex Perez for Taryn Serra-Cruz [19-13725] (ECF: Luis Perez) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 09/20/2019 as to Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz. [Entered: 09/23/2019 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz on 09/20/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/30/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/04/2019 as to Appellant Taryn Serra-Cruz. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/18/2019 as to Appellee Carnival Corporation [Entered: 09/23/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases where Carnival PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Luis Alexander Perez