This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/06/2022 at 06:14:24 (UTC).

Tanesha Cole v. Jesse Scroggin, et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Tanesha Cole filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jesse Scroggin,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-12260

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TANESHA COLE

Defendant / Appellees

JESSE SCROGGIN

LOGAN GRANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tanesha Cole

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David J. Canupp

Allison B. Chandler

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

NOA DE# 32

Open Document

***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)*** APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allison B. Chandler for Logan Grant and Jesse Scroggin. [22-12260]--[Edited 07/22/2022 by SKJ] (ECF: David Canupp) [Entered: 07/21/2022 04:33 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David J. Canupp for Logan Grant and Jesse Scroggin. [22-12260] (ECF: David Canupp) [Entered: 07/21/2022 04:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allison B. Chandler for Logan Grant and Jesse Scroggin. [22-12260] (ECF: Allison Chandler) [Entered: 07/22/2022 09:58 AM]

Open Document

USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Tanesha Cole was filed on 07/20/2022. Docket Entry 37. [Entered: 07/22/2022 02:47 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Tanesha Cole. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9729347-1] [Entered: 08/03/2022 09:47 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Tanesha Cole. [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:16 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Tanesha Cole, Court Reporter: Unknown Reporter, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 05/04/2022. [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:33 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Tanesha Cole. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 08/04/2022 03:26 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David J. Canupp for Appellees Logan Grant and Jesse Scroggin. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12260] (ECF: David Canupp) [Entered: 08/10/2022 12:42 PM]

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David J. Canupp for Appellees Logan Grant and Jesse Scroggin. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12260] (ECF: David Canupp) [Entered: 08/10/2022 12:42 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Tanesha Cole. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 08/04/2022 03:26 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Tanesha Cole, Court Reporter: Unknown Reporter, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 05/04/2022. [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Tanesha Cole. [Entered: 07/28/2022 04:16 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Appellant Tanesha Cole. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9729347-1] [Entered: 08/03/2022 09:47 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketUSDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Tanesha Cole was filed on 07/20/2022. Docket Entry 37. [Entered: 07/22/2022 02:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allison B. Chandler for Logan Grant and Jesse Scroggin. [22-12260] (ECF: Allison Chandler) [Entered: 07/22/2022 09:58 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022

DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY No action will be taken on Appearance of Counsel filed by Allison B. Chandler for Jesse Scroggin and Logan Grant. Pursuant to FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii), a person cannot electronically file through another person's account. Please submit through the appropriate account of the ECF filer reflected on the signature block of the filed document. [Entered: 07/22/2022 09:38 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David J. Canupp for Logan Grant and Jesse Scroggin. [22-12260] (ECF: David Canupp) [Entered: 07/21/2022 04:34 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)*** APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allison B. Chandler for Logan Grant and Jesse Scroggin. [22-12260]--[Edited 07/22/2022 by SKJ] (ECF: David Canupp) [Entered: 07/21/2022 04:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Tanesha Cole on 07/06/2022. Fee Status: IFP Pending. USDC motion pending: Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, DE# 33. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/26/2022 as to Appellant Tanesha Cole. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/09/2022 as to Appellee Jesse Scroggin [Entered: 07/12/2022 02:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less