This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/11/2020 at 06:05:28 (UTC).

Takeda Pharmaceutical Company v. Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 Takeda Pharmaceutical Company filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1552

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

TORRENT PHARMA INC.

INDOCO REMEDIES LTD.

TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LTD.

Plaintiff / Appellees

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LTD.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.

TAKEDA IRELAND LIMITED

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

William L. Mentlik Esq.

Attorney at Lerner, David, Littenberg, Krumholz & Mentlik, LLP

20 Commerce Drive

Cranford, NJ 07016

H. Keeto Sabharwal Esq.

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1200 17Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Cedric Chia Yang Tan

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1200 17Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Yun Wei

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

1200 17Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Ivan Michael Poullaos

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

John Reynolds McNair

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Alison Michelle Heydorn

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

35 W Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

George C. Lombardi Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-9703

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Charles Michael Lizza

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

One Riverfront Plaza

Newark, NJ 07102

Jason G. Winchester

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Lisamarie LoGiudice Ph.D.

Attorney at Jones Day

222 East 41St Street

New York, NY 10017

Gregory A. Castanias

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 21 ] filed by Appellants Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Indoco Remedies Ltd. The opening briefs are due 06/25/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [692695] [LMN] [Entered: 05/07/2020 08:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. Service: 04/30/2020 by email. [691397] [20-1552] [H. Sabharwal] [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DECLARATION of Keeto Sabharwal IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEFS for Appellants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. Service: 04/20/2020 by email. [691391] [20-1552] [H. Sabharwal] [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION of Appellants Indoco Remedies Ltd., Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. to extend the time to 06/25/2020 to file the Opening Briefs. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 04/30/2020 by email. [691353] [20-1552] [Ivan Poullaos] [Entered: 04/30/2020 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Indoco Remedies Ltd.. Service: 04/23/2020 by email. [689466] [20-1552] [Ivan Poullaos] [Entered: 04/23/2020 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Entry of appearance for John R. McNair as of counsel for Indoco Remedies Ltd.. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689264] [20-1552] [John McNair] [Entered: 04/22/2020 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Entry of appearance for George Lombardi as of counsel for Indoco Remedies Ltd.. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689260] [20-1552] [George Lombardi] [Entered: 04/22/2020 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Entry of appearance for Alison M. Heydorn as of counsel for Indoco Remedies Ltd.. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689258] [20-1552] [Alison Heydorn] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certificate of Interest for Indoco Remedies Ltd.. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689256] [20-1552] [Ivan Poullaos] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Entry of appearance for Ivan Poullaos as principal counsel for Indoco Remedies Ltd.. Service: 04/22/2020 by email. [689254] [20-1552] [Ivan Poullaos] [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Takeda Ireland Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682205] [20-1552] [Gregory Castanias] [Entered: 03/26/2020 09:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Lisamarie LoGiudice as of counsel for Appellees Takeda Ireland Limited, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682203] [20-1552] [Gregory Castanias] [Entered: 03/26/2020 08:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Jason G. Winchester as of counsel for Appellees Takeda Ireland Limited, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682202] [20-1552] [Gregory Castanias] [Entered: 03/26/2020 08:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Gregory A. Castanias as principal counsel for Appellees Takeda Ireland Limited, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682201] [20-1552] [Gregory Castanias] [Entered: 03/26/2020 08:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Cedric Chia Yang Tan as of counsel for Appellants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682120] [20-1552] [Cedric Tan] [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682113] [20-1552] [H. Sabharwal] [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682106] [20-1552] [H. Sabharwal] [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for H. Keeto Sabharwal as principal counsel for Appellants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682103] [20-1552] [H. Sabharwal] [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Yun Wei as of counsel for Appellants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682015] [20-1552] [Yun Wei] [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/02/2020. [678139] Entry of Appearance is due 03/26/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/26/2020. Docketing Statement is due 03/26/2020. Appellant's brief is due 05/11/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 03/12/2020 10:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAKEDA IRELAND LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where INDOCO REMEDIES LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD. is a litigant