This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/25/2021 at 06:06:38 (UTC).

Taji Lee v. Tony Iannuzzi, et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Taji Lee filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Tony Iannuzzi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2600

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TAJI JEMAL LEE

Frackville, PA 17932

Defendant / Appellees

TONY IANNUZZI

KAREN HOLLY

JOHN STEINHART

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

RICHARD P. ROLLER

JOHN KERESTES

WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES

CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Taji Jemal Lee

Attorney at Mahanoy SCI

301 Morea Road

Frackville, PA 17932

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Samuel H. Foreman Esq.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

Four Ppg Place5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Caitlin J. Goodrich Esq.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

2000 Market Streetsuite 1300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Raymond W. Dorian Esq.

Attorney at Pennsylvania Department of Corrections

1920 Technology Parkway

Mechanicsburg, PA 17050

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

DC Order 7/23/21

1 #3

caption

1 #4

Standing Order

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#3

#4

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Taji Jemal Lee. (TMM) [Entered: 09/17/2021 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION filed by Appellant Taji Jemal Lee to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 08/30/2021. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 09/17/2021 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Caitlin J. Goodrich, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Tony Iannuzzi. [21-2600] (CJG) [Entered: 09/02/2021 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Raymond W. Dorian, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Karen Holly; John Steinhart; PA Department of Corrections; Richard P. Roller; and John Kerestes.. [21-2600] (RWD) [Entered: 09/01/2021 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 08/26/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Taji Jemal Lee in District Court No. 1-16-cv-02154. (TMM) [Entered: 08/26/2021 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond W. Dorian Esq.