This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/03/2019 at 06:09:19 (UTC).

T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd. v. Expedia Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Expedia Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1010

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

EXPEDIA INC. (DE)

ORBITZ WORLDWIDE, INC.

EXPEDIA GROUP, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

T-JAT SYSTEMS 2006 LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven L. Caponi

Attorney at K&l Gates Llp

600 N King Street, Suite 901

Wilmington, DE 19801

Elizabeth Weiskopf

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

925 Fourth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104

Theodore J. Angelis

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

925 Fourth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Colin Mayo

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes P.C.

500 Delaware Avenue, Po Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19899

Daniel Joseph Melman

Attorney at Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz LLP

1500 Broadway, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Guy Yonay

Attorney at Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz LLP

1500 Broadway, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: motion to extend time to file brief Docket No. [ # 22 ], ERROR: The motion did not include a certificate of compliance. CORRECTION: For future filings, please ensure that the document includes a certificate of compliance. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [653142] [TAM] [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting motion to extend time to file Appellees' response brief [ # 22 ] filed by Appellees Orbitz Worldwide, Inc. and Expedia Group, Inc. No further extensions should be anticipated. The response brief is due 01/29/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [653141] [TAM] [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE of Appellant T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd. to the motion [ # 22 ] filed by Appellees Expedia Group, Inc. and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 11/27/2019 by email. [652774] [20-1010] [Guy Yonay] [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION of Appellees Expedia Group, Inc. and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc. to extend the time to 01/29/2020 to file the Appellees' brief. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 11/22/2019 by email. [651877] [20-1010] [Theodore Angelis] [Entered: 11/22/2019 06:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) FILED from Appellant T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 11/20/2019 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [651029] [20-1010] [Guy Yonay] [Entered: 11/20/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Entry of appearance for Daniel J. Melman as of counsel for Appellant T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd.. Service: 11/20/2019 by email. [651028] [20-1010] [Guy Yonay] [Entered: 11/20/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MODIFIED ENTRY: Corrected Entry of appearance for Elizabeth Weiskopf as of counsel for Appellees Expedia Group, Inc. and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 11/14/2019 by email. [649346]--[Edited 11/18/2019 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Elizabeth Weiskopf] [Entered: 11/14/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Expedia Group, Inc. and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc., Entry of Appearance for Elizabeth Weiskopf [ # 17 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 11/20/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [649039] [TAM] [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Entry of appearance for Elizabeth Weiskopf as of counsel for Appellees Expedia Group, Inc. and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 11/07/2019 by email. [647943] [20-1010] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 18 ] [Elizabeth Weiskopf] [Entered: 11/07/2019 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Amended Docketing Statement for the Appellees Expedia Group, Inc. and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 11/01/2019 by email. [646398] [20-1010] [Theodore Angelis] [Entered: 11/01/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Expedia Inc. (DE) and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 10/24/2019 by email. [644419] [20-1010] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 12 ] [Theodore Angelis] [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for Theodore J. Angelis as principal counsel for Appellees Expedia Inc. (DE) and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 10/24/2019 by email. [644417] [20-1010] [Theodore Angelis] [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellees Expedia Inc. (DE) and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc., Entry of Appearance for Theodore J. Angelis, Certificate of Interest ad Docketing Statement [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 10/28/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [643514] [TAM] [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd.. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643251] [20-1010] [Guy Yonay] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd.. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643247] [20-1010] [Guy Yonay] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Guy Yonay as principal counsel for Appellant T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd.. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643246] [20-1010] [Guy Yonay] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Expedia Inc. (DE) and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643242] [20-1010] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Theodore Angelis] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Expedia Inc. (DE) and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643241] [20-1010] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Theodore Angelis] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Theodore J. Angelis as principal counsel for Appellees Expedia Inc. (DE) and Orbitz Worldwide, Inc.. Service: 10/18/2019 by email. [643239] [20-1010] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Theodore Angelis] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/25/2019. [640375] Entry of Appearance due 10/18/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/18/2019. Docketing Statement due 10/18/2019. Appellant's brief is due 12/03/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orbitz Worldwide, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Expedia Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Expedia, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Melman