This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/20/2021 at 06:25:40 (UTC).

Sylvester Davis, Jr. v. Warden, et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Sylvester Davis, Jr filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11320

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

SYLVESTER DAVIS, JR.

Bessemer, AL 35023

Respondent / Appellees

WARDEN

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Sylvester Davis Jr.

Attorney at Donaldson CF - Inmate Legal Mail

100 Warrior Ln

Bessemer, AL 35023

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Kristi Oggs Wilkerson

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Steven Marshall

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

HAB-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DE #35 Final Judgment

Open Document #4

DE #34 Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Sylvester Davis, Jr.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/03/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThis APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 06/03/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kristi Oggs Wilkerson for Appellees Attorney General, State of Alabama and Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11320] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 05/10/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristi Oggs Wilkerson for Attorney General, State of Alabama and Warden and Steven Marshall for Attorney General, State of Alabama and Warden. [21-11320] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 05/06/2021 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying COA as to Appellant Sylvester Davis, Jr. was filed on 04/26/2021. Docket Entry 39. [Entered: 04/29/2021 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Sylvester Davis, Jr. on 04/19/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 04/23/2021 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Marshall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristi O Wilkerson