This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/27/2021 at 06:16:19 (UTC).

Swinomish Indian Tribal Cmty., et al v. Lummi Nation

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Swinomish Indian Tribal Cmty filed an Other lawsuit against Lummi Nation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35812

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SWINOMISH INDIAN TRIBAL COMMUNITY

TULALIP TRIBES

UPPER SKAGIT INDIAN TRIBE

Respondent

LUMMI NATION

Not Classified By Court

STILLAGUAMISH TRIBE OF INDIANS

HOH INDIAN TRIBE

SUQUAMISH INDIAN TRIBE

STATE OF WASHINGTON

JAMESTOWN S'KLALLAM TRIBE

PORT GAMBLE S'KLALLAM TRIBE

SKOKOMISH INDIAN TRIBE

LOWER ELWHA KLALLAM TRIBE

PUYALLUP TRIBE OF INDIANS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Emily Hutchinson Haley

Attorney at Office of the Tribal Attorney

11404 Moorage Way

La Conner, WA 98257-0817

James M. Jannetta

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE TRIBAL ATTORNEY

P.O. Box 817

La Conner, WA 98257-0817

Mason D. Morisset

Attorney at Morisset, Schlosser Jozwiak & Somerville

811 First Avenue, Suite 218

Seattle, WA 98104-1509

Kristin E. Ballinger

Attorney at Harrigan Leyh Farmer & Thomsen, LLP

999 Third Avenue, Suite 4400

Seattle, WA 98104

Tyler Lawrence Farmer

Attorney at Harrigan Leyh Farmer & Thomsen, LLP

999 Third Avenue, Suite 4400

Seattle, WA 98104

Arthur W. Harrigan Jr.

Attorney at Harrigan Leyh Farmer & Thomsen, LLP

999 Third Avenue, Suite 4400

Seattle, WA 98104

David Stoller Hawkins

Attorney at UPPER SKAGIT INDIAN TRIBE

25944 Community Plaza Way

Sedro Wooley, WA 98284

Respondent Attorneys

Deanne Maynard

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20037

Mark David McPherson

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster, LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

James M. Schurz

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster, LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

James Sigel

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster, LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Claire R. Newman

1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3700

Seattle, WA 98101

Rob Roy Smith

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3700

Seattle, WA 98101

Lea Ann Easton

Attorney at DORSAY & EASTON LLP

1737 Ne Alberta Street

Portland, OR 97211

Craig J. Dorsay Esquire

Attorney at DORSAY & EASTON LLP

1737 Ne Alberta Street

Portland, OR 97211

James Rittenhouse Bellis Esquire

Attorney at Office of the Reservation Attorney

P.O. Box 498

Suquamish, WA 98392

John W. Ogan

Attorney at Law Office of John W Ogan

P.O. Box 1192

Sisters, OR 97759

Michael S. Grossmann

Attorney at AGWA - Office of the Washington Attorney General (Olympia)

P.O. Box 40100, 1125 Washington St., Se

Olympia, WA 98504-0100

Lauren Patricia Rasmussen Esquire

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LAUREN P. RASMUSSEN, PLLC

1904 Third Ave.

Seattle, WA 98101

Earle David Lees III

Attorney at Skokomish Indian Tribe

80 N Tribal Center Road

Shelton, WA 98584

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lummi Nation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/05/2021. [12247390] [21-35812] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 10/05/2021 09:04 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/05/2021. [12247497] [21-35812] (Hutchinson Haley, Emily) [Entered: 10/05/2021 09:59 AM]

#11

(#11) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 10/19/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12249604] (LW) [Entered: 10/06/2021 02:26 PM]

#12

(#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [12282209] (LW) [Entered: 11/09/2021 08:54 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#16) Streamlined request [15] by Appellant Lummi Nation to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Lummi Nation opening brief due 12/22/2021. Appellees Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Tulalip Tribes and Upper Skagit Indian Tribe answering brief due 01/21/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12290783] (DLM) [Entered: 11/17/2021 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Lummi Nation. New requested due date is 12/22/2021. [12290605] [21-35812] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 11/17/2021 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#14) Terminated Claire R. Newman for Stillaguamish Tribe of Indians in 21-35812 [12289074] (QDL) [Entered: 11/16/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Claire R. Newman for Real Party in Interest Stillaguamish Tribe of Indians. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 11/16/2021. [12288610] [21-35812] (Newman, Claire) [Entered: 11/16/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [12282209] (LW) [Entered: 11/09/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 10/19/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12249604] (LW) [Entered: 10/06/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket(#10) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/05/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12247892]. [21-35812] (AD) [Entered: 10/05/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket(#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/05/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12247891]. [21-35812] (AD) [Entered: 10/05/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Swinomish Indian Tribal Community Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/05/2021. [12247497] [21-35812] (Hutchinson Haley, Emily) [Entered: 10/05/2021 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Lummi Nation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/05/2021. [12247390] [21-35812] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 10/05/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#6) Terminated Jeremiah Miller for Tulalip Tribes in 21-35812. Not involved in case. [12242084] (SB) [Entered: 09/28/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) James Sigel for party(s) Appellant Lummi Nation, in case 21-35812. [12241684] (DJV) [Entered: 09/28/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Deanne Maynard for party(s) Appellant Lummi Nation, in case 21-35812. [12241678] (DJV) [Entered: 09/28/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James R. Sigel (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 425 Market Street, San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellant Lummi Nation. Date of service: 09/28/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12241673] [21-35812] (Sigel, James) [Entered: 09/28/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard (Morrison & Foerster LLP, 2100 L Street, NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20037) for Appellant Lummi Nation. Date of service: 09/28/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12241666] [21-35812] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 09/28/2021 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Lummi Nation Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/05/2021. Appellant Lummi Nation opening brief due 11/22/2021. Appellees Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Tulalip Tribes and Upper Skagit Indian Tribe answering brief due 12/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12241463] (JBS) [Entered: 09/28/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swinomish Indian Tribal Community is a litigant

Latest cases where Puyallup Tribe of Indians is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Rittenhouse Bellis Esquire