This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2019 at 06:08:04 (UTC).

Swanson v. MA Supreme Judicial Court

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Swanson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MA Supreme Judicial Court. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1269

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CARL SWANSON

Boston, MA 02127

Defendant / Appellee

MASSACHUSETTS SUPREME JUDICIAL COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Carl Swanson

Po Box E37

Boston, MA 02127

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Timothy Dismas Hartnett

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RESPONSE filed by Appellant Carl Swanson to order regarding untimely appeal [ # 6242774-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/11/2019. [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:08 PM]

Open Document

LETTER sent to Appellant Carl Swanson addressing his recent correspondence docketed May 1, 2019 providing status of appeal and enclosing docket sheet. [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document

INFORMATIVE MOTION to waive transcript order form filed by Appellant Carl Swanson. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1269]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (AL) [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:25 PM]

Open Document

ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that appellant either move for voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) or show cause, in writing, why this appeal should not be dismissed. The failure to take either action by April 11, 2019 will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. See 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:39 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • DOCKET sheet sent to appellant. [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER sent to Appellant Carl Swanson addressing his recent correspondence docketed May 1, 2019 providing status of appeal and enclosing docket sheet. [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INFORMATIVE MOTION to waive transcript order form filed by Appellant Carl Swanson. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1269]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (AL) [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE filed by Appellant Carl Swanson to order regarding untimely appeal [ # 6242774-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/11/2019. [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that appellant either move for voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) or show cause, in writing, why this appeal should not be dismissed. The failure to take either action by April 11, 2019 will lead to dismissal of the appeal for lack of diligent prosecution. See 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellant Carl Swanson was granted in the district court by order dated 03/12/2019. [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 03/20/2019 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #31) filed by Appellant Carl Swanson. [19-1269] (AL) [Entered: 03/20/2019 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.