This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/29/2020 at 06:01:36 (UTC).

Svetlana Lokhova v. Stefan Halper

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 Svetlana Lokhova filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Stefan Halper. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1368

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

STEFAN A. HALPER

THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY

NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC, d/b/a MSNBC

WP COMPANY LLC, d/b/a The Washington Post

DOW JONES AND COMPANY, INCORPORATED, d/b/a The Wall Street Journal

DOW JONES & COMPANY, INCORPORATED, d/b/a The Wall Street Journal

Plaintiff / Appellant

SVETLANA LOKHOVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Terrance Gilroy Reed

Attorney at LANKFORD & REED, PLLC

120 North Saint Asaph Street

Alexandria, VA 22314-0000

Robert Kirk Moir

Attorney at LANKFORD & REED, PLLC

120 North Saint Asaph Street

Alexandria, VA 22314-0000

Robert D. Luskin

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS LLP

875 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-2400

Alexander Richard Green

Attorney at LECLAIR RYAN, PC

2318 Mill Road

Alexandria, VA 22314-0000

John Francis Hundley

Attorney at TROUT CACHERIS & SOLOMON PLLC

1627 I Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Dana R. Green

Attorney at NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY

620 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018-0000

Patrick John Curran Jr.

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE, LLP

1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-3401

Laura Rose Handman

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE, LLP

1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-3401

Matthew Edward Kelley

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR, LLP

1909 K Street, Nw, 20006

Washington, DC 20006-1157

Seth Daniel Berlin

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR, LLP

1909 K Street, Nw, 20006

Washington, DC 20006-1157

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Steven Scott Biss

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF STEVEN S. BISS

300 West Main Street

Charlottesville, VA 22903

 

Court Documents

#31

29 #2

Transcript order form

29 #1

Transcript Acknowledgment

#28

#27

#26

#24

#19

RESTRICTED

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#5

#2

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Customized BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Svetlana Lokhova.. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/24/2020. Respons Brief due 07/24/2020 Opening/Response Brief Due: 07/24/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 08/24/2020. [20-1368, 20-1437] JHM [Entered: 05/15/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Anneliese Thomson in 20-1368, 20-1437. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Oral Argument on Motions to Dismiss -- 10/25/2019. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Svetlana Lokhova. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00632-LMB-JFA. Transcript due from Anneliese Thomson, Official Court Reporter on 07/10/2020. [20-1368, 20-1437] TW [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER filed rescinding briefing deadlines. Copies to all parties. [1000732509] [20-1368, 20-1437] TW [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by NBCUniversal Media, LLC and WP Company LLC for Anneliese Thomson. [20-1368] Patrick Curran [Entered: 05/01/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by NBCUniversal Media, LLC and WP Company LLC, Dow Jones and Company, Inc., The New York Times Company in 20-1368. [20-1368, 20-1437]--[Edited 04/24/2020 by JHM - edited to include all parties] Patrick Curran [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Stefan A. Halper. [20-1437] Terrance Reed [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Docket correction requested from The New York Times Company. Re: [ # 19 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. [20-1368] JHM [Entered: 04/15/2020 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Sveltana Lokhova.. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/26/2020. Opening/Response Brief Due: 06/24/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 07/24/2020. [20-1368, 20-1437] JHM [Entered: 04/15/2020 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1437 with 20-1368. Cross-appeal appellant: Svetlana Lokhova. Copies to all parties.. [1000721671] [20-1368, 20-1437] JHM [Entered: 04/15/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER filed rescinding briefing order Copies to all parties. [1000721600] [20-1368] JHM [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Laura Handman for NBCUniversal Media, LLC and WP Company LLC. [1000718416] [20-1368] Patrick Curran [Entered: 04/09/2020 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patrick John Curran Jr. for NBCUniversal Media, LLC and WP Company LLC. [1000718409] [20-1368] Patrick Curran [Entered: 04/09/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert K. Moir for Stefan A. Halper. [1000715748] [20-1368] Robert Moir [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stefan A. Halper. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000715643] [20-1368] Terrance Reed [Entered: 04/06/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Terrance G. Reed for Stefan A. Halper. [1000715638] [20-1368] Terrance Reed [Entered: 04/06/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew E. Kelley for Dow Jones and Company, Incorporated. [1000714429] [20-1368] Matthew Kelley [Entered: 04/02/2020 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dow Jones and Company, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000714427] [20-1368] Seth Berlin [Entered: 04/02/2020 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Seth D. Berlin for Dow Jones and Company, Incorporated. [1000714425] [20-1368] Seth Berlin [Entered: 04/02/2020 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00632-LMB-JFA.. [20-1368] JHM [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00632-LMB-JFA. Case manager: JMoore. [20-1368] JHM [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NBCUniversal Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Scott Biss