This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/05/2021 at 06:17:12 (UTC).

Susanne Hurd v. USIC LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 Susanne Hurd filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against USIC LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3230

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Susanne R. Hurd

Scottsbluff, NE 69361

Defendant / Appellees

USIC LLC

CenturyLink

Mediacom

City of Volga

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Susanne R. Hurd

50965 County Road 27

Scottsbluff, NE 69361

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Susanne R. Hurd due 11/24/2021 [5096584] [21-3230] (CMH) [Entered: 11/10/2021 02:14 PM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Motions and Affidavit for Permission to Appeal IFP

Open Restricted Document #2

ProSe NDA

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Appellant Ms. Susanne R. Hurd w/service 11/17/2021. [5098631] [21-3230] (CMH) [Entered: 11/17/2021 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Susanne R. Hurd due 11/24/2021 [5096584] [21-3230] (CMH) [Entered: 11/10/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 11/03/2021, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [5084337] [21-3230] (CMH) [Entered: 10/06/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5084334] [21-3230] (CMH) [Entered: 10/06/2021 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order filed 8/24/2021, Writ filed 8/26/2021 and Order filed 10/5/2021. [5084333] [21-3230] (CMH) [Entered: 10/06/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5084325] [21-3230] (CMH) [Entered: 10/06/2021 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDIACOM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURYLINK is a litigant