This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/28/2022 at 06:07:17 (UTC).

Susan Rogers v. AO Smith Corp, et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Susan Rogers filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AO Smith Corp,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2592

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

 

Party Details

Defendants

AO SMITH CORP

A W CHESTERTON INC

ALLEN BRADLEY CO

ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO

AURORA PUMP CO

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC

BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC, (AS SUCCESSOR TO AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.)

BEAZER EAST INC, formerly known as KOPPERS

BF GOODRICH CO

BLACKMER PUMP

BOILER TUBE CO OF AMERICA

BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA INC, (SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AMOCO)

BROUDY SUPPLY

BRYANT HEATING AND COOLING

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

BURNHAM LLC

BW IP INC

Plaintiff / Appellant

SUSAN M. ROGERS, ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM R. ROGERS, III, DECEASED, AND WIDOW IN HER OWN RIGHT

Defendant / Appellee

BELDEN WIRE & CABLE CO LLC

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christine O. Boyd Esq.

Attorney at Lavin O'Neil Cedrone & DiSipio

190 North Independence Mall West, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Edward T. Finch Esq.

Attorney at Lavin O'Neil Cedrone & DiSipio

190 North Independence Mall West, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Eric J. Kadish Esq.

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michele N. Miller Esq.

Attorney at Lavin O'Neil Cedrone & DiSipio

190 North Independence Mall West, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

John A. Turlik Esq.

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

1818 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

G. Daniel Bruch Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Swartz Campbell

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street, 38Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Nicole Lengel Esq.

Attorney at Bennett Bricklin & Saltzburg

1500 Market Street, Center Square, 32Nd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Alyson M. Sciacca Esq.

Attorney at Bennett Bricklin & Saltzburg

1500 Market Street, Center Square, 32Nd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Jennifer A. McGarrity Esq.

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James P. Hadden Esq.

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

William R. Adams Esq.

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

1650 Arch Street, Suite 2110

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Catherine N. Jasons Esq.

Attorney at Kelley Jasons McGowan Spinelli Hanna & Reber

1818 Market Street, Suite 3205

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John J. Dugan Esq.

Attorney at Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi

123 Egg Harbor Road, Suite 406, Tower Commons

Sewell, NJ 08080

Dawn Dezii Esq.

Attorney at Margolis Edelstein

100 Century Parkway, Suite 200

Mount Laurel, NJ 08054

Daniel J. Ryan Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Matthew C. Brunelli Esq.

Attorney at Stevens & Lee

1500 Market Street, Centre Square

Philadelphia, PA 19102

David J. Parsells Esq.

Attorney at Stevens & Lee

620 Freedom Business Center, Suite 200

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

Michael J. Block Esq.

Attorney at Wilbraham Lawler & Buba

1600 Market Street, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert E. Paul Esq.

Attorney at Paul Reich & Myers

1608 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Alan I. Reich Esq.

Attorney at Paul Reich & Myers

1608 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19103

41 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

31 #2

Mediation Instructions

31 #1

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

#30

(#30) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee CBS Corp. [22-2592] (JPM) [Entered: 10/07/2022 02:04 PM]

#29

(#29) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney James Tate, Esq. for Appellee Burnham LLC Burnham, LLC does not intend to participate in this appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/03/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-2592] (MDE) [Entered: 10/03/2022 02:49 PM]

#28

(#28) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Counsel for Appellees requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/13/2022. Disclosure Statement on or before 10/13/2022.--[Edited 09/29/2022 by SLC] (SLC) [Entered: 09/29/2022 12:42 PM]

#27

(#27) ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: Kathleen D. Wilkinson, Esq. for Chevron USA Inc Appellee Chevron USA Inc will not participate in this appeal, received. [22-2592] (KDW) [Entered: 09/27/2022 12:31 PM]

#26

(#26) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Carrier Corp. [22-2592] (JDN) [Entered: 09/26/2022 06:23 PM]

#25

(#25) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James D. Nelson on behalf of Appellee(s) Carrier Corporation. [22-2592] (JDN) [Entered: 09/26/2022 06:22 PM]

#24

(#24) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Basil A. DiSipio, Esq. for Appellee 3M Written notification to the Court that 3M Company does not intend to participate in this appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 09/23/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-2592] (BAD) [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:55 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Susan M. Rogers. [22-2592] (REP) [Entered: 09/12/2022 10:11 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee CBS Corp. [22-2592] (JPM) [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:29 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee General Electric Co. [22-2592] (JPM) [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:28 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. McShea, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) General Electric Company and CBS Corporation. [22-2592] (JPM) [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:27 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Caption

1 #3

Memorandum

1 #2

Order

#1

Notice of Appeal

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (SY) [Entered: 10/26/2022 02:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee CBS Corp. [22-2592] (JPM) [Entered: 10/07/2022 02:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney James Tate, Esq. for Appellee Burnham LLC Burnham, LLC does not intend to participate in this appeal. Certificate of Service dated 10/03/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-2592] (MDE) [Entered: 10/03/2022 02:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Counsel for Appellees requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/13/2022. Disclosure Statement on or before 10/13/2022.--[Edited 09/29/2022 by SLC] (SLC) [Entered: 09/29/2022 12:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: Kathleen D. Wilkinson, Esq. for Chevron USA Inc Appellee Chevron USA Inc will not participate in this appeal, received. [22-2592] (KDW) [Entered: 09/27/2022 12:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Carrier Corp. [22-2592] (JDN) [Entered: 09/26/2022 06:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James D. Nelson on behalf of Appellee(s) Carrier Corporation. [22-2592] (JDN) [Entered: 09/26/2022 06:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Basil A. DiSipio, Esq. for Appellee 3M Written notification to the Court that 3M Company does not intend to participate in this appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 09/23/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-2592] (BAD) [Entered: 09/23/2022 02:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: John J. Dugan, Esq. for Beazer East Inc Appellee Beazer East Inc will not participate in this appeal, received. [22-2592] (JJD) [Entered: 09/22/2022 04:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: Notice of Non-Participation filed by Appellee Riley Stoker Corp. Certificate of Service dated 09/22/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-2592] (JPD) [Entered: 09/22/2022 11:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Susan M. Rogers advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [22-2592] (REP) [Entered: 09/12/2022 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard P. Myers on behalf of Appellant(s) Susan M. Rogers, Administratrix of the Estate of William R. Rogers, III, deceased, and in her own right. [22-2592] (REP) [Entered: 09/12/2022 10:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert E. Paul on behalf of Appellant(s) Susan M. Rogers, Administratrix of the Estate of William R. Rogers, III, deceased, and widow in her own right. [22-2592] (REP) [Entered: 09/12/2022 10:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Susan M. Rogers. [22-2592] (REP) [Entered: 09/12/2022 10:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Susan M. Rogers. [22-2592] (REP) [Entered: 09/12/2022 10:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee CBS Corp. [22-2592] (JPM) [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee General Electric Co. [22-2592] (JPM) [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. McShea, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) General Electric Company and CBS Corporation. [22-2592] (JPM) [Entered: 09/02/2022 04:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 08/29/2022 01:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Susan M. Rogers in District Court No. 2-19-cv-00573. (SLC) [Entered: 08/29/2022 01:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOILER TUBE CO OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLEN-SHERMAN-HOFF is a litigant

Latest cases where BRYANT HEATING & COOLING SYSTEMS (DIS) is a litigant

Latest cases where BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC is a litigant