This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:32 (UTC).

Susan Fennell v. Navient Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Susan Fennell filed an Other lawsuit against Navient Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12654

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

SUSAN FENNELL, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ashley Nicole Wydro

Attorney at Sessions Fishman Nathan & Israel, LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33618

Brian D. Roth

Attorney at Sessions Fishman Nathan & Israel, LLC

3850 N Causeway Blvd Ste 200

Metairie, LA 70002-7227

Vitaliy Kats

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1900, Bank Of America Plaza

Tampa, FL 33602-3925

Dayle Marie Van Hoose

Attorney at Sessions Fishman Nathan & Israel, LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33618

Kimberly S. Mello

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, PA

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1900, Bank Of America Plaza

Tampa, FL 33602-3925

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher W. E. Boss

Attorney at Boss Law, PLLC

9887 4Th St Ne Ste 202

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Jarrett L. Ellzey

Attorney at Hughes Ellzey, LLP

2700 Post Oak Blvd Ste 1120, Galleria Tower I

Houston, TX 77056-5767

William Craft Hughes

Attorney at Hughes Ellzey, LLP

2700 Post Oak Blvd Ste 1120, Galleria Tower I

Houston, TX 77056-5767

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly S. Mello for Appellee Navient Solutions, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12654] (ECF: Kimberly Mello) [Entered: 08/12/2019 05:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly S. Mello for Navient Solutions, LLC [19-12654] (ECF: Kimberly Mello) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:40 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney William Craft Hughes for Appellant Susan Fennell. [19-12654] (ECF: William Hughes) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:29 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by W. Craft Hughes, representing Susan Fennell Attorney William Craft Hughes for Appellant Susan Fennell. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12654] (ECF: William Hughes) [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:15 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Vitaliy Kats for Navient Solutions, LLC [19-12654] (ECF: Vitaliy Kats) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document #1

DIS-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney William Craft Hughes for Appellant Susan Fennell. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [19-12654] (ECF: William Hughes) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:54 PM]

Open Document #3

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William Craft Hughes for Susan Fennell. [19-12654] (ECF: William Hughes) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:53 PM]

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Susan Fennell. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/03/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:02 AM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 07/23/2019 as to Appellant Susan Fennell. [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:56 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dayle M. Van Hoose, Attorney for Appellee, Navient Solutions, LLC [19-12654] (ECF: Dayle Van Hoose) [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:57 PM]

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney William Craft Hughes for Appellant Susan Fennell. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:09 AM]

Open Document #2

DC #160 Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. GBT, BBM and BCG [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly S. Mello for Appellee Navient Solutions, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12654] (ECF: Kimberly Mello) [Entered: 08/12/2019 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Vitaliy Kats for Navient Solutions, LLC [19-12654] (ECF: Vitaliy Kats) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly S. Mello for Navient Solutions, LLC [19-12654] (ECF: Kimberly Mello) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney William Craft Hughes for Appellant Susan Fennell. [19-12654] (ECF: William Hughes) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dayle M. Van Hoose, Attorney for Appellee, Navient Solutions, LLC [19-12654] (ECF: Dayle Van Hoose) [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by W. Craft Hughes, representing Susan Fennell Attorney William Craft Hughes for Appellant Susan Fennell. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12654] (ECF: William Hughes) [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Susan Fennell. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/03/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to William Craft Hughes for Susan Fennell. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney William Craft Hughes for Appellant Susan Fennell. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney William Craft Hughes for Appellant Susan Fennell. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [19-12654] (ECF: William Hughes) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William Craft Hughes for Susan Fennell. [19-12654] (ECF: William Hughes) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 07/23/2019 as to Appellant Susan Fennell. [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Susan Fennell on 07/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/29/2019 as to Appellant Susan Fennell. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/12/2019 as to Appellee Navient Solutions, LLC [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.