This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:49 (UTC).

Superior Energy Services Colum v. Premium Petroleum Services S.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Superior Energy Services Colum filed an Other lawsuit against Premium Petroleum Services S. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2176

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas

Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L., FKA Premium Petroleum Services Corp.

Superior Energy Services, Inc.

Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan

Superior Energy Services Columbia S.A.S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

John Gerard McCarthy

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Roger Juan Maldonado

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Mark A. Cymrot Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Paul M. Levine Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/28/2019, RECEIVED.[2612582] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:44 AM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT AMENDED JUDGMENT, dated 07/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2612586] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:45 AM]

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/28/2019, RECEIVED.[2612594] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:46 AM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Superior Energy Services Columbia S.A.S and Superior Energy Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2617455] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:31 PM]

10 #1

Form C FILED

10 #2

Supporting Document

#34

(#34) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 09/13/2019, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2654708] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:32 AM]

#33

(#33) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2654702] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:30 AM]

#32

(#32) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[2654698] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:28 AM]

#27

(#27) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654090] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:22 PM]

#26

(#26) ORDER, dated 09/06/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/20/2019, unless Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, submit the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2649409] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:25 PM]

#23

(#23) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, informing Court of proposed due date 10/28/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2629791] [19-2176] [Entered: 08/12/2019 12:45 PM]

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Superior Energy Services Columbia S.A.S and Superior Energy Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2627116] [19-2176] [Entered: 08/08/2019 09:43 AM]

#17

(#18) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, FILED.[2621753] [19-2176] [Entered: 08/01/2019 08:34 AM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 09/13/2019, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2654708] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2654702] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[2654698] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654090] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER, dated 09/06/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/20/2019, unless Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, submit the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2649409] [19-2176] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, informing Court of proposed due date 10/28/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2629791] [19-2176] [Entered: 08/12/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ATTORNEY, Paul M. Levine for Superior Energy Services, Inc. Superior Energy Services Columbia S.A.S, in case 19-2176, [ # 21 ], ADDED.[2628041] [19-2176] [Entered: 08/08/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Superior Energy Services Columbia S.A.S and Superior Energy Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2627116] [19-2176] [Entered: 08/08/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ATTORNEY, Roger Juan Maldonado for Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, in case 19-2176, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2621756] [19-2176] [Entered: 08/01/2019 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, FILED.[2621753] [19-2176] [Entered: 08/01/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/19/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2620447] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2619673] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/29/2019 06:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2619672] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/29/2019 06:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Superior Energy Services Columbia S.A.S and Superior Energy Services, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2617455] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/25/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#6) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17247128, FILED.[2612605] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2612600] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/28/2019, RECEIVED.[2612594] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT AMENDED JUDGMENT, dated 07/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2612586] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/28/2019, RECEIVED.[2612582] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Victor Augusto Palacio Gaitan, Premium Petroleum Services S. de R.L. and Maria Eugenia Hernand Rojas, FILED. [2612146] [19-2176] [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.