This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/26/2023 at 06:55:36 (UTC).

Super Interconnect v. HP Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Super Interconnect filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HP Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1332

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

HP INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

SUPER INTERCONNECT TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel J. Goettle Esq.

Jennifer Kurcz

Theresa Weisenberger Esq.

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jeffrey Bragalone

Thomas William Kennedy Jr.

Daniel Fletcher Olejko

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/26/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER granting motion [ # 16 ] and the appeal is dismissed. Each side shall bear its own costs. ISSUED AS A MANDATE: March 26, 2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [681844] [LMS] [Entered: 03/26/2020 08:43 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellant Super Interconnect Technologies LLC and Appellee HP Inc. to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b). [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/20/2020 by email. [680743]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 03/20/2020 07:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 14 ] filed by Appellant Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. The opening brief is due 03/23/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [678819] [MMA] [Entered: 03/13/2020 07:29 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION of Appellant Super Interconnect Technologies LLC to extend the time to 03/23/2020 to file the Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/09/2020 by email. [677298] [20-1332] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 03/09/2020 03:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. Service: 01/22/2020 by email. [665227] [20-1332] [Jeffrey Bragalone] [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:48 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. Service: 01/22/2020 by email. [665225] [20-1332] [Jeffrey Bragalone] [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:47 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for Daniel F. Olejko as of counsel for Appellant Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. Service: 01/22/2020 by email. [665222] [20-1332] [Jeffrey Bragalone] [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for T. William Kennedy as of counsel for Appellant Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. Service: 01/22/2020 by email. [665220] [20-1332] [Jeffrey Bragalone] [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:44 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Jeffrey R. Bragalone as principal counsel for Appellant Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. Service: 01/22/2020 by email. [665218] [20-1332] [Jeffrey Bragalone] [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:42 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellee HP Inc.. Service: 01/22/2020 by email. [664988] [20-1332] [Daniel Goettle] [Entered: 01/22/2020 09:17 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee HP Inc., Docketing Statement [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 01/28/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [664760] [CAB] [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:38 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee HP Inc.. Service: 01/21/2020 by email. [664502] [20-1332] [Daniel Goettle] [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:02 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellee HP Inc.. Service: 01/21/2020 by email. [664494] [20-1332] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 7 ] [Daniel Goettle] [Entered: 01/21/2020 10:59 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Theresa M. Weisenberger as of counsel for Appellee HP Inc.. Service: 01/21/2020 by email. [664492] [20-1332] [Theresa Weisenberger] [Entered: 01/21/2020 10:56 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Jennifer M. Kurcz as of counsel for Appellee HP Inc.. Service: 01/21/2020 by email. [664489] [20-1332] [Jennifer Kurcz] [Entered: 01/21/2020 10:49 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Daniel J. Goettle as principal counsel for Appellee HP Inc.. Service: 01/21/2020 by email. [664487] [20-1332] [Daniel Goettle] [Entered: 01/21/2020 10:45 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/02/2020. [661461] Entry of Appearance due 01/22/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/22/2020. Docketing Statement due 01/22/2020. Appellant's brief is due 03/09/2020. [MMA] [Entered: 01/08/2020 12:08 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less