This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2019 at 06:20:12 (UTC).

Subodh Pandit v. Sudhir Pandit

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Subodh Pandit filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Sudhir Pandit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1045

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CATHALINE R. SAMUEL

SUDHIR K. PANDIT

MESHACH V. SAMUEL

DOROTHY PANDIT

Plaintiff / Appellant

SUBODH K. PANDIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mary Catherine Biscoe-Hall Esq.

Attorney at LEDER & HALE, PC

401 Washington Avenue

Baltimore, MD 21204

Steven E. Leder

Attorney at LEDER & HALE, PC

401 Washington Avenue

Baltimore, MD 21204

Kelly Lynn Burchell

Attorney at BURCHELL & HUGHES PLLC

1900 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brian M. Maul Esq.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BRIAN M. MAUL, LLC

47 East South Street

Frederick, MD 21701

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER filed [1000467434] withdrawing counsel ; administratively terminating Motion to strike [ # 14 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:48 PM]

#14

(#14) MOTION by Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel to strike Attorney's appearance... Date and method of service: 02/28/2019 ecf. [1000467388] [19-1045] Mary Biscoe-Hall [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:22 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed [1000457446] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 03/13/2019. Response brief due 04/12/2019 Copies to all parties. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:09 PM]

12 #2

Additional Document

12 #1

MOTION

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary C. Biscoe-Hall for Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel. [1000457142] [19-1045] Mary Biscoe-Hall [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:13 PM]

10 #2

Additional Document

10 #1

Disclosure of corporate affiliations

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven E. Leder for Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel. [1000440942] [19-1045] Steven Leder [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:41 PM]

8 #2

Additional Document

8 #1

Disclosure of corporate affiliations

#5

(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Subodh K. Pandit. [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:51 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Subodh K. Pandit. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000437360] [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:50 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian M Maul for Subodh K. Pandit. [1000437357] [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:49 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01136-PX.. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:18 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER filed [1000467434] withdrawing counsel ; administratively terminating Motion to strike [ # 14 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION by Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel to strike Attorney's appearance... Date and method of service: 02/28/2019 ecf. [1000467388] [19-1045] Mary Biscoe-Hall [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER filed [1000457446] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 03/13/2019. Response brief due 04/12/2019 Copies to all parties. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by Subodh K. Pandit to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 20, 2019.. Date and method of service: 02/13/2019 ecf. [1000457163] [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary C. Biscoe-Hall for Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel. [1000457142] [19-1045] Mary Biscoe-Hall [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Meshach V. Samuel and Cathaline R. Samuel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000440944] [19-1045] Steven Leder [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven E. Leder for Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel. [1000440942] [19-1045] Steven Leder [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Dorothy Pandit and Sudhir K. Pandit. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000439903] [19-1045] Kelly Burchell [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kelly Lynn Burchell for Dorothy Pandit and Sudhir K. Pandit. [1000439882] [19-1045] Kelly Burchell [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/20/2019. Response Brief due 03/22/2019 [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Subodh K. Pandit. [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Subodh K. Pandit. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000437360] [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian M Maul for Subodh K. Pandit. [1000437357] [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01136-PX.. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01136-PX. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less