This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/09/2021 at 06:14:18 (UTC).

Students for Fair Admissions v. University of Texas at Austin

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Students for Fair Admissions filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against University of Texas at Austin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-50715

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated

Defendant / Appellees

University of Texas at Austin

James B. Milliken, Chancellor of the University of Texas System in his Offical Capacity

Steven Leslie, Executive Vice Chancellor for Academic Affairs of the University of Texas System in his Official Capacity

Daniel Sharphorn, Vice Chancellor and General Counsel of the University of Texas System in his Official Capacity

Jay Hartzell, Interim President of the University of Texas at Austin in his Official Capacity

Board of Regents of the Texas State University System

David J. Beck, Member of the Board of Regents in his Official Capacity

Christian Melton Crain, Member of the Board of Regents in her Official Capacity

Kevin P. Eltife, Member of the Board of Regents in his Official Capacity

R. Steven Hicks, Member of the Board of Regents in his Official Capacity

Jodie Lee Jiles, Member of the Board of Regents in his Official Capacity

Janiece Longoria, Member of the Board of Regents in her Official Capacity

Nolan Perez, Member of the Board of Regents in his Official Capacity

Kelcy L. Warren, Member of the Board of Regents in his Official Capacity

James C. (Rad) Weaver, Member of the Board of Regents in his Official Capacity

Daniel Jaffe, Interim Executive Vice President and Provost

Rachelle Hernandez, Senior Vice Provost for Enrollment Management and Student Success

Miguel Wasielewski, Executive Director for Office of Admissions

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee

Black Student Alliance

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Cameron Thomas Norris

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy, P.L.L.C.

1600 Wilson Boulevard

Arlington, VA 22209

Steven Christopher Begakis

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy, P.L.L.C.

1600 Wilson Boulevard

Arlington, VA 22209

John Michael Connolly

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy, P.L.L.C.

1600 Wilson Boulevard

Arlington, VA 22209

William S. Consovoy

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy, P.L.L.C.

1600 Wilson Boulevard

Arlington, VA 22209

Thomas McCarthy

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy, P.L.L.C.

1600 Wilson Boulevard

Arlington, VA 22209

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew Christopher Powers Esq.

Attorney at Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, P.C.

401 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

William Christian

Attorney at Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, P.C.

401 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

John J. McKetta Esq. III

Attorney at Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, P.C.

401 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

Marianne W. Nitsch

Attorney at Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, P.C.

401 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian Pidcock

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth, L.L.P.

600 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

David G. Hinojosa

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1500 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Neil K. Gilman

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth, L.L.P.

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [21-50715] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated. Date of service: 10/04/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Begakis, Connolly, Consovoy, McCarthy, Norris; Attorney for Appellees: Christian, Gilman, Hinojosa, McKetta, Nitsch, Pidcock, Powers [21-50715] (John Michael Connolly ) [Entered: 10/04/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 11/03/2021 for Appellees Adaylin Alvarez, David J. Beck, Morgan Bennett, Black Student Alliance, Board of Regents of the Texas State University System, Christina Melton Crain, Kevin P. Eltife, Jay Hartzell, Rachelle Hernandez, R. Steven Hicks, Daniel Jaffe, Jodie Lee Jiles, Liz Kufour, Steven Leslie, Janiece Longoria, Brianna Mallorie McBride, James B. Milliken, Desiree Ortega-Santiago, Nolan Perez, Nima Rahman, Daniel Sharphorn, Texas NAACP, Texas Orange Jackets, Alexandra Trujillo, University of Texas at Austin, Kelcy L. Warren, Miguel Wasielewski, James C. (Rad) Weaver and Rosaleen Xiong [21-50715] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated. Date of service: 10/04/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Begakis, Connolly, Consovoy, McCarthy, Norris; Attorney for Appellees: Christian, Gilman, Hinojosa, McKetta, Nitsch, Pidcock, Powers [21-50715] (John Michael Connolly ) [Entered: 10/04/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Rosaleen Xiong in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Alexandra Trujillo in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Nima Rahman in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Desiree Ortega-Santiago in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Brianna Mallorie McBride in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Liz Kufour in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Morgan Bennett in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Adaylin Alvarez in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Texas NAACP in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Texas Orange Jackets in 21-50715, Attorney Brian Pidcock for Appellee Black Student Alliance in 21-50715 [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 09/15/2021 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Neil K. Gilman for party(s) Appellee Texas Orange Jackets Appellee Texas NAACP Appellee Desiree Ortega-Santiago Appellee Morgan Bennett Appellee Black Student Alliance Appellee Adaylin Alvarez Appellee Brianna Mallorie McBride Appellee Alexandra Trujillo Appellee Liz Kufour Appellee Nima Rahman Appellee Rosaleen Xiong, in case 21-50715 [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David G. Hinojosa for party(s) Appellee Texas Orange Jackets Appellee Texas NAACP Appellee Desiree Ortega-Santiago Appellee Morgan Bennett Appellee Black Student Alliance Appellee Adaylin Alvarez Appellee Brianna Mallorie McBride Appellee Alexandra Trujillo Appellee Liz Kufour Appellee Nima Rahman Appellee Rosaleen Xiong, in case 21-50715 [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Christian for party(s) Appellee Daniel Jaffe Appellee Daniel Sharphorn Appellee Miguel Wasielewski Appellee University of Texas at Austin Appellee Steven Leslie Appellee Kevin P. Eltife Appellee James C. (Rad) Weaver Appellee Jodie Lee Jiles Appellee David J. Beck Appellee Board of Regents of the Texas State University System Appellee James B. Milliken Appellee Christina Melton Crain Appellee R. Steven Hicks Appellee Rachelle Hernandez Appellee Jay Hartzell Appellee Janiece Longoria Appellee Nolan Perez Appellee Kelcy L. Warren, in case 21-50715 [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marianne W. Nitsch for party(s) Appellee Daniel Jaffe Appellee Daniel Sharphorn Appellee Miguel Wasielewski Appellee University of Texas at Austin Appellee Steven Leslie Appellee Kevin P. Eltife Appellee James C. (Rad) Weaver Appellee Jodie Lee Jiles Appellee David J. Beck Appellee Board of Regents of the Texas State University System Appellee James B. Milliken Appellee Christina Melton Crain Appellee R. Steven Hicks Appellee Rachelle Hernandez Appellee Jay Hartzell Appellee Janiece Longoria Appellee Nolan Perez Appellee Kelcy L. Warren, in case 21-50715 [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Matthew Christopher Powers for party(s) Appellee Daniel Jaffe Appellee Daniel Sharphorn Appellee Miguel Wasielewski Appellee University of Texas at Austin Appellee Steven Leslie Appellee Kevin P. Eltife Appellee James C. (Rad) Weaver Appellee Jodie Lee Jiles Appellee David J. Beck Appellee Board of Regents of the Texas State University System Appellee James B. Milliken Appellee Christina Melton Crain Appellee R. Steven Hicks Appellee Rachelle Hernandez Appellee Jay Hartzell Appellee Janiece Longoria Appellee Nolan Perez Appellee Kelcy L. Warren, in case 21-50715 [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 09/09/2021 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50715] (Brian Pidcock ) [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50715] (Neil K. Gilman ) [Entered: 09/08/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) John Michael Connolly for party(s) Appellant Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated, in case 21-50715 [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 08/16/2021 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Steven Christopher Begakis for party(s) Appellant Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated, in case 21-50715 [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:20-CV-763. Electronic ROA due on 08/31/2021. [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9643933-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-50715] (CAS) [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50715] (John Michael Connolly ) [Entered: 08/13/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50715] (Steven Christopher Begakis ) [Entered: 08/13/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Cameron Thomas Norris for Appellant Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated in 21-50715 [21-50715] (MVM) [Entered: 08/11/2021 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [21-50715] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/10/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: McKetta, Pidcock; Attorney for Appellant: Norris [21-50715] (Cameron Thomas Norris ) [Entered: 08/10/2021 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Cameron Thomas Norris for Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50715] (Cameron Thomas Norris ) [Entered: 08/10/2021 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Students for Fair Admissions, Incorporated [21-50715] (MFY) [Entered: 08/10/2021 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN, also known as UT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian C Pidcock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil K. Gilman(Designation Retained)