This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/18/2022 at 06:00:49 (UTC).

Streety v. Rusco Operating

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Streety filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Rusco Operating. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-50644

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Jim Streety, Individually and For Other Similarly Situated

Intervenor

Rusco Operating, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Richard J. Burch

11 Greenway Plaza

Houston, TX 77046-0000

Andrew Wells Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza

Houston, TX 77046

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza

Houston, TX 77046

Lindsay Itkin Reimer

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza

Houston, TX 77046

Richard Mark Schreiber

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza

Houston, TX 77046

Intervenor Attorneys

Ross Michael MacDonald

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, L.L.P.

1100 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Ramsey Davis

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, L.L.P.

1100 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Caitlin A. Halpern

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, L.L.P.

1100 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Charles Rosson

Attorney at Gibbs & Bruns, L.L.P.

1100 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C. [22-50644] (AS) [Entered: 07/20/2022 11:24 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9899576-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/09/2022 for Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C. [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 07/25/2022 11:52 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Richard Mark Schreiber ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 11:06 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Lindsay Itkin Reimer ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 11:09 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Michael A. Josephson ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 11:11 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Ross Michael MacDonald for Rusco Operating, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50644] (Ross Michael MacDonald ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:06 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Caitlin A. Halpern ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:13 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Michael Ramsey Davis ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:45 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Charles Rosson ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:48 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Richard J. Burch for Mr. Jim Streety for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50644] (Richard J. Burch ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 07:36 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/15/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Burch, Dunlap, Josephson, Reimer, Schreiber; Attorney for Appellants: Davis, Halpern, MacDonald, Rosson [22-50644] (Michael Ramsey Davis ) [Entered: 08/15/2022 12:24 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/11/2022 for Appellant RUSCO Operating, L.L.C.. [22-50644] (DDL) [Entered: 08/30/2022 04:13 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/11/2022 for Appellant RUSCO Operating, L.L.C.. [22-50644] (DDL) [Entered: 08/30/2022 04:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-50644] (DDL) [Entered: 08/30/2022 04:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 7:20-CV-49. Electronic ROA due on 08/30/2022. [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 08/15/2022 12:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/15/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Burch, Dunlap, Josephson, Reimer, Schreiber; Attorney for Appellants: Davis, Halpern, MacDonald, Rosson [22-50644] (Michael Ramsey Davis ) [Entered: 08/15/2022 12:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ross Michael MacDonald for Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C. in 22-50644 [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 08/09/2022 04:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Caitlin A. Halpern for party(s) Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C., in case 22-50644 [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 08/09/2022 04:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Ramsey Davis for party(s) Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C., in case 22-50644 [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 08/09/2022 04:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles Rosson for party(s) Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C., in case 22-50644 [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 08/09/2022 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Richard J. Burch for Appellee Jim Streety in 22-50644 [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 08/09/2022 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael A. Josephson for party(s) Appellee Jim Streety, in case 22-50644 [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 08/09/2022 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Richard J. Burch for Mr. Jim Streety for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50644] (Richard J. Burch ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 07:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Charles Rosson ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Michael Ramsey Davis ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Caitlin A. Halpern ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Ross Michael MacDonald for Rusco Operating, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50644] (Ross Michael MacDonald ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Michael A. Josephson ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 11:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Lindsay Itkin Reimer ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 11:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-50644] (Richard Mark Schreiber ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 11:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9899576-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/09/2022 for Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C. [22-50644] (CBW) [Entered: 07/25/2022 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Rusco Operating, L.L.C. [22-50644] (AS) [Entered: 07/20/2022 11:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RUSCO OPERATING, LLC is a litigant