This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 01:06:06 (UTC).

Stratton Peay v. CO Sager, et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Stratton Peay filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against CO Sager. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1131

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

MCKEEL

C/O SAGER

HEASLEY

Defendant / Appellees

PA LISA ZUPSIC

C/O SAGER

Plaintiff / Appellant

STRATTON PEAY

Collegeville, PA 19426

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

John P. Senich Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Benjamin M. Lombard Esq.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

Four Ppg Place, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Meghan K. Adkins Esq.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

Four Ppg Place, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Samuel H. Foreman Esq.

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

Four Ppg Place, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kemal A. Mericli Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stratton Peay

Attorney at Phoenix SCI

P.O. Box 244

Collegeville, PA 19426

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

District Court Memorandum Order 1/3/19

Open Document #5

Order re: Page/Word Limits

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kemal Alexander Mericli on behalf of Appellee(s) Sager, Berry, Smail, Rittenhouse, Horton, Ennis, Kim Smith, Overmyer, Oberlander, Kunig, Miller, Gustafson, Bertolini, Sheasly, Cowan, Simon. [19-1131] (KAM) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:40 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to John P. Senich, Jr., Esq. for Sager requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/14/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:49 PM]

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #3

District Court Report

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel H. Foreman on behalf of Appellee(s) Lisa Zupsic. [19-1131] (SHF) [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document #1

Clerk IFP PLRA Order - Listing for 1915

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) For all parties represented by John P. Senich, Jr., Esq., or any other attorney from the Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General, the designated filer shall be C.O. Sager. (CJG) [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:25 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benjamin M. Lombard on behalf of Appellee(s) Lisa Zupsic. [19-1131] (BML) [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:29 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kemal Alexander Mericli on behalf of Appellee(s) Sager, Berry, Smail, Rittenhouse, Horton, Ennis, Kim Smith, Overmyer, Oberlander, Kunig, Miller, Gustafson, Bertolini, Sheasly, Cowan, Simon. [19-1131] (KAM) [Entered: 02/28/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to John P. Senich, Jr., Esq. for Sager requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/14/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Mr. Stratton Peay. The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Mr. Stratton Peay, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Mr. Stratton Peay, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Mr. Stratton Peay, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Stratton Peay to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (CJG) [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benjamin M. Lombard on behalf of Appellee(s) Lisa Zupsic. [19-1131] (BML) [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel H. Foreman on behalf of Appellee(s) Lisa Zupsic. [19-1131] (SHF) [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) For all parties represented by John P. Senich, Jr., Esq., or any other attorney from the Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General, the designated filer shall be C.O. Sager. (CJG) [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Stratton Peay in District Court No. 1-16-cv-00130. (CJG) [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.