This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/10/2020 at 06:18:28 (UTC).

Stonehaven, LLC v. 4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Stonehaven, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against 4402 Mammoth Investors, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1202

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

STONEHAVEN, LLC

Debtor

In re: 4402 MAMMOTH INVESTORS, LLC

Appellee

4402 MAMMOTH INVESTORS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Michael H. Weiss

Attorney at Weiss & Spees, LLP

6310 San Vicente Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellee Attorney

Mark T. Young

Attorney at DONAHOE & YOUNG LLP

25152 Springfield Court

Valencia, CA 91355

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Notice of Referral

#2

3 #1

Opening Letter Schedule

3 #2

Briefing Order

#3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

3 #4

BAP Rules

3 #5

E-Filing Administrative Order

#4

5 #1

Designation of Record on Appeal

5 #2

Designation of Issue on Appeal

#6

#7

#8

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Deputy Clerk; CLS); for lack of prosecution. Re: Brief past due Appellant Stonehaven, LLC's opening brief due 10/26/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 07:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of readiness docketed. (CLS) [Entered: 09/10/2020 05:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the Notice of Transcripts filed in Bk. Ct. 08/24/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of Designation of Record on Appeal and Designation of Issue on Appeal. filed in Bk. Ct. 08/24/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 03:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the amended notice of appeal filed in Bk. Ct. 08/11/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 08/12/2020 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Stonehaven, LLC. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Stonehaven, LLC's opening brief due 09/25/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 08/11/2020 02:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of Deficiency Notice to Appellant - Does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree. filed in Bk. Ct. 08/11/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 08/11/2020 and notice of referral. (CLS) [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STONEHAVEN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 4402 MAMMOTH INVESTORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark T Young