This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2020 at 06:06:49 (UTC).

Steves and Sons, Inc. v. Jeld-Wen, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Steves and Sons, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jeld-Wen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1425

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

STEVES AND SONS, INC.

Defendant / Appellant

JELD-WEN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Gregory Sergi

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-0000

Glenn D. Pomerantz

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-0000

John Samuel Martin

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Douglas McCarley Garrou

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Matthew Robert McGuire

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Robert Dennis Fairbanks

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

1 Bank Of America Plaza, 421 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-0000

Kyle Mach

Attorney at MUNGER & STONE, LLP

999 Peachtree Street, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-0000

Emily Claire Curran-Huberty

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON, LLP

560 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2907

Maya M. Eckstein

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

William Howell Wright Esq. Jr.

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Marvin Grady Pipkin

Attorney at PIPKIN LAW

10001 Reunion Place

San Antonio, TX 78216

Lewis F. Powell III

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Kortney M. Kloppe-Orton

Attorney at PIPKIN LAW

10001 Reunion Place

San Antonio, TX 78216

Michael Randolph Shebelskie Esq.

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Benjamin Joseph Horwich

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON, LLP

560 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2907

Ted G. Dane

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Amanda Lee DeFord

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Brian Charles Riopelle

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Elizabeth Page Redpath

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Gregory James DuBoff

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00098-REP. Mailed to: Huberty, Dane, Deford, Duboff, Garrou, Mach, Redpath, Sergi. [20-1425] TF [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER filed granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 16 ] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Huberty, Dane, Deford, Duboff, Garrou, Mach, Redpath, Sergi. [1000731054] [20-1425] TF [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION by Jeld-Wen, Inc. to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [16]. Date and method of service: 04/30/2020 ecf. [1000731021] [20-1425] Paul Clement [Entered: 04/30/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Huberty, Dane, Deford, Duboff, Garrou, Mach, Redpath, Sergi. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/01/2020. Response Brief due 07/01/2020 [20-1425] TF [Entered: 04/22/2020 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeld-Wen, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000725826] [20-1425] Paul Clement [Entered: 04/22/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [20-1425] Paul Clement [Entered: 04/22/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Erin E. Cady for Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [1000725766] [20-1425] Erin Cady [Entered: 04/22/2020 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Harker Rhodes IV for Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [1000725761] [20-1425] C. Rhodes [Entered: 04/22/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Erin E. Murphy for Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [1000725759] [20-1425] Erin Murphy [Entered: 04/22/2020 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul D. Clement for Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [1000725754] [20-1425] Paul Clement [Entered: 04/22/2020 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marvin G. Pipkin for Steves and Sons, Inc.. [1000722304] [20-1425] Marvin Pipkin [Entered: 04/16/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Maya M. Eckstein for Steves and Sons, Inc.. [1000721666] [20-1425] Maya Eckstein [Entered: 04/15/2020 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew R. McGuire for Steves and Sons, Inc.. [1000721620] [20-1425] Matthew McGuire [Entered: 04/15/2020 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lewis F. Powell III for Steves and Sons, Inc.. [1000721601] [20-1425] Lewis Powell [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steves and Sons, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000721147] [20-1425] Benjamin Horwich [Entered: 04/14/2020 07:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin J. Horwich for Steves and Sons, Inc.. [1000721146] [20-1425] Benjamin Horwich [Entered: 04/14/2020 07:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00098-REP. Mailed to: Huberty, Dane, DeFord, DuBoff, Garrou, Mach, Redpath, Sergi. [20-1425] TF [Entered: 04/14/2020 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:20-cv-00098-REP. Case manager: TFischer. [20-1425] TF [Entered: 04/14/2020 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVES AND SONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JELD-WEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth P. Redpath

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda L DeFord