This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/21/2020 at 06:06:58 (UTC).

Steves and Sons, Inc. v. Jeld-Wen, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Steves and Sons, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jeld-Wen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2466

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

3Rd Party Defendants

EDWARD STEVES

JOHN G. PIERCE

SAMUEL STEVES

Plaintiff / Appellee

STEVES AND SONS, INC.

Defendant / Appellant

JELD-WEN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Defendant and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Glenn D. Pomerantz

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-0000

Marvin Grady Pipkin

Attorney at PIPKIN LAW

10001 Reunion Place

San Antonio, TX 78216

Maya M. Eckstein

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

951 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Kortney M. Kloppe-Orton

Attorney at PIPKIN LAW

10001 Reunion Place

San Antonio, TX 78216

Benjamin Joseph Horwich

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON, LLP

560 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2907

William H. Ford

Attorney at FORD MURRAY, PLLC

10001 Reunion Place

San Antonio, TX 78216

Patricia Bugg Turner

Attorney at SPOTTS FAIN, PC

411 East Franklin Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Dana McDaniel

Attorney at SPOTTS FAIN, PC

411 East Franklin Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

David L. Johnson

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Rowland Braxton Hill IV

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & BARTON, LLP

1200 Mutual Building, 909 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3095

Michael Willis Smith Esq.

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & BARTON, LLP

1200 Mutual Building, 909 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3095

Margaret Moran Zwisler

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Sarah M. Ray

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

505 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Brian Charles Riopelle

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Alfred C. Pfeiffer

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

505 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

C. Harker Rhodes IV

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Lawrence E. Buterman

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

885 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022-0000

Paul D. Clement

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Craig Thomas Merritt

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & BARTON, LLP

1200 Mutual Building, 909 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3095

Erin Elizabeth Murphy

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 16 ]. Opening brief and appendix due 04/03/2020. Response brief due 05/04/2020.Number of days granted: 45. Copies to all parties. [1000679734] [19-2466] TF [Entered: 02/10/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by Jeld-Wen, Inc. to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until April 3, 2020.. Date and method of service: 02/07/2020 ecf. [1000679475] [19-2466] Paul Clement [Entered: 02/07/2020 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/18/2020. Response Brief due 03/19/2020 [19-2466] TF [Entered: 01/07/2020 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [19-2466] TF [Entered: 01/07/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeld-Wen, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000656388] [19-2466] Paul Clement [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [19-2466] Paul Clement [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Erin E. Cady for Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [1000656374] [19-2466] Erin Cady [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Harker Rhodes IV for Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [1000656368] [19-2466] C. Rhodes [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Erin E. Murphy for Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [1000656365] [19-2466] Erin Murphy [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul D. Clement for Jeld-Wen, Inc.. [1000656363] [19-2466] Paul Clement [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marvin G. Pipkin for Steves and Sons, Inc., Edward Steves and Samuel Steves. [1000656133] [19-2466] Marvin Pipkin [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Maya M. Eckstein for Steves and Sons, Inc.. [1000655033] [19-2466] Maya Eckstein [Entered: 01/03/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lewis F. Powell III for Steves and Sons, Inc.. [1000655032] [19-2466] Lewis Powell [Entered: 01/03/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steves and Sons, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000654418] [19-2466] Benjamin Horwich [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Benjamin J. Horwich for Steves and Sons, Inc.. [1000654407] [19-2466] Benjamin Horwich [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00545-REP. Mailed to: Johnson, Maltas, Pfeiffer, Ray, Buterman. [19-2466] TF [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00545-REP. Case manager: TFischer. [19-2466] TF [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVES AND SONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JELD-WEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGARET M. ZWISLER(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowland Braxton Hill, IV