This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:39 (UTC).

Steven Yormak v. Steven Yormak

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Steven Yormak filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Steven Yormak. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12681

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants and Defendant / Appellees

STEVEN R. YORMAK

BENJAMIN H. YORMAK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Steven R. Yormak

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edward R. Miller

Attorney at Miller Hollander & Jeda

5278 Golden Gate Pkwy Ste 2

Naples, FL 34116

Richard J. Hollander

Attorney at Miller Hollander & Jeda

5278 Golden Gate Pkwy Ste 2

Naples, FL 34116

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Steven R. Yormak's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard J. Hollander for Appellee Benjamin H. Yormak. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12681] (ECF: Richard Hollander) [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:14 PM]

Open Document #2

DE #19 Opinion and Order

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Steven R. Yormak. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8852229-1] [Entered: 08/13/2019 04:09 PM]

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Steven R. Yormak's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Steven R. Yormak is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8852229-2 ] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Steven R. Yormak. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8852229-1] [Entered: 08/13/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard J. Hollander for Appellee Benjamin H. Yormak. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12681] (ECF: Richard Hollander) [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Steven R. Yormak on 07/15/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/26/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/02/2019 as to Appellant Steven R. Yormak. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/16/2019 as to Appellee Benjamin H. Yormak [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.