This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:12 (UTC).

Steven Lisle, Jr. v. James Diercks, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Steven Lisle, Jr against James Diercks in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2340

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KEVIN MURRAY

DANIEL DUNN

JACQUELINE LASHBROOK

FRANK EOVALDI

JAMES DIERCKS

Plaintiff / Appellant

STEVEN D. LISLE, JR.

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. for reconsideration of motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. [12] [7027060] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:28 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER re: Motion to reconsider appellant motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to reconsider is DENIED. [ # 12 ] [13] [7029033] JLW [19-2340] (AG) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:08 PM]

Open Document #2

Mandate

Open Document #1

Final Order

11 #1

Final Order

11 #2

Mandate

#6

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER: re: 1. Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. 2. Memorandum un support of PLRA motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. 3. Declaration in support of motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [ # 6 ] The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED. See Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000). Appellant has not identified a good faith issue that the district court erred in granting the motion for sanctions and dismissing his complaint with prejudice. Appellant shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days, or this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1335 0134. [10] [7022373] JLW [19-2340] (CAG) [Entered: 08/08/2019 09:42 AM]

9 #2

District Court Order

9 #1

Supplement filed

#8

(#8) ORDER re: Motion for appointment of counsel. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is currently pending before this court and, therefore, his fee status is unresolved. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the court's fee notice and order dated July 15, 2019. [ # 4 ] [8] [7021107] CMD [19-2340] (AG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:01 PM]

#4

(#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. for appointment of counsel. [4] [7021067] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:37 PM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7021071] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:40 PM]

3 #1

PLRA D.C. Denial of IFP

3 #2

PLRA Fee Notice AC

#2

(#2) Filed notice of change of address for Steven Lisle to Dixon Correctional Center. [2] [7017922] [19-1339, 19-2340] (AP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:10 PM]

#1

Civil Rights Case

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER re: Motion to reconsider appellant motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to reconsider is DENIED. [ # 12 ] [13] [7029033] JLW [19-2340] (AG) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. for reconsideration of motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. [12] [7027060] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/29/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7026836-2] [7026836] [19-2340] (CM) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED for failure to pay the required docketing fee pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). The appellant shall remit to the clerk of the district court the $505 appellate fees. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. The pro se appellant was DENIED leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis by the appellate court on 08/08/2019 and was given 14 days to pay the $505 filing fee. The pro se appellant has not paid the $505 appellate fee.[11][7026820] [19-2340] (CM) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: re: 1. Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. 2. Memorandum un support of PLRA motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. 3. Declaration in support of motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [ # 6 ] The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED. See Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000). Appellant has not identified a good faith issue that the district court erred in granting the motion for sanctions and dismissing his complaint with prejudice. Appellant shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days, or this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1335 0134. [10] [7022373] JLW [19-2340] (CAG) [Entered: 08/08/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Declaration for Motion for IFP on Appeal filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. (Document forwarded from the District Court). [9] [7021986] [19-2340] (DSL) [Entered: 08/06/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re: Motion for appointment of counsel. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is currently pending before this court and, therefore, his fee status is unresolved. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the court's fee notice and order dated July 15, 2019. [ # 4 ] [8] [7021107] CMD [19-2340] (AG) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [7] [7021074] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Trust account statement included. [6] [7021073] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7021071] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. for appointment of counsel. [4] [7021067] [19-2340] (PS) [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Steven D. Lisle, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/17/2019. [3] [7019168] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 08/23/2019. [19-2340] (DSL) [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed notice of change of address for Steven Lisle to Dixon Correctional Center. [2] [7017922] [19-1339, 19-2340] (AP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Steven D. Lisle Jr. by 07/22/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 07/29/2019.. [1] [7017342] [19-2340] (CAG) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.