This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 05:07:59 (UTC).

Steven Iglesias v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Steven Iglesias filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70377

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEVEN MANUEL IGLESIAS, AKA Steven Acosta, AKA Steven M. Iglesias Acosta, AKA Steven Iglesias, AKA Steven Iglesias Acosta, AKA Steven M. Iglesias Acosta

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wilson Purves Esquire

Attorney at Kerosky Purves & Bogue

142 Sansome Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Respondent Attorneys

Richard Kelley

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #4

BIA Decision

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #3

Petition for Review & Motion for Stay of Removal

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Richard Kelley for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, in case 20-70377. [11596071] (QDL) [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard J. Kelley (Office of Immigration Litigation Civil Division; U.S. Department of Justice; P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station; Washington, D.C. 20044) for Respondent William P. Barr. Substitution for Attorney OIL for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 02/13/2020. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [11596061] [20-70377] (Kelley, Richard) [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11595709]. [20-70377] (CD) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 03/18/2020. Response to motion for stay due 04/08/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 05/18/2020 for Steven Manuel Iglesias. Respondent brief due 07/16/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11595010] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.