This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/04/2021 at 06:02:31 (UTC).

Henderson v. Atmos Engy

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Henderson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Atmos Engy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-30691

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Steven Eugene Henderson

Defendant / Appellee

Atmos Energy Corporation, incorrectly named as Atmos Energy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Connie Phuong Trieu

Attorney at Trieu Law, L.L.C.

537 Holmes Boulevard

Gretna, LA 70056

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

John Daniel Rayburn Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Daigle Rayburn, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 3667

Lafayette, LA 70502

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Steven Eugene Henderson [20-30691] (MAS) [Entered: 11/05/2020 08:44 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER granting jurisdictional review to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9463525-2]. Mandate issue date is 01/13/2021. [20-30691] (WMJ) [Entered: 12/22/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-30691] (MAS) [Entered: 12/15/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Steven Eugene Henderson [20-30691] (MAS) [Entered: 11/05/2020 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atmos Energy Corporation is a litigant